Jordan v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Plaintiff: Luke Jordan
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00020
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint JP Morgan Chase Bank NA answer due 3/14/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/6/19. (jw)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by All Defendants. (Bruce, Philip)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint JP Morgan Chase Bank NA answer due 3/5/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/19/19. (jw)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Bruce, Philip)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint JP Morgan Chase Bank NA answer due 2/19/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/12/19. (jw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA . (Bruce, Philip)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Bruce, Philip)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip R Bruce on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Bruce, Philip)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Jordan. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA served on 1/15/2019. (Leonard, Jana)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Luke Jordan (Haupt, Shannon)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Luke Jordan (Leonard, Jana)
January 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2844288. (Leonard, Jana)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (nv)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank NA filed by Luke Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Jordan
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Philip R Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?