Reed v. Lorents

Plaintiff: Morgan Reed
Defendant: Edward K Lorents
Case Number: 5:2019cv00036
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 03/07/19. (wh)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 03/07/19. (wh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward K Lorents. (Scimeca, Peter)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Remand to State court filed by Morgan Reed. (D'Antonio, Cynthia)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Casey T Delaney on behalf of Edward K Lorents (Delaney, Casey)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Edward K Lorents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Dental Arts Payroll Records, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Dr. Lorents)(Scimeca, Peter)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Scimeca on behalf of Edward K Lorents (Scimeca, Peter)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Edward K Lorents. (em)
January 15, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2846393. (D'Antonio, Cynthia)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edward K Lorents filed by Morgan Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Lorents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Reed
Represented By: Cynthia Rowe D'Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward K Lorents
Represented By: Peter L Scimeca
Represented By: Casey T Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?