Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes v. Watson Laboratories Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Does 1 through 100, Actavis LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis Pharma Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00042
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transfer Order)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Minutes of Teleconference filed in MD-17-2804, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Regarding Remands filed in MD-17-2804, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order filed in MD-17-2804)(Frazer, T) Modified on 3/1/19 to add descriptions to exhibits.
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid-related cases transferred to MDL, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Hearing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transfer Order re Choctaw Nation and Chickasaw Nation cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corp., et al. Order re stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - County of Floyd v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order re stay, #8 Exhibit 8 - City of Alexandria v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order re stay, #9 Exhibit 9 - St. Bernard Parish Gov't v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order re stay, #10 Exhibit 10 - City of San Mateo v. McKesson Corp., et al. Order re stay, #11 Exhibit 11 - Village of Melrose Park, et al. v. McKesson Corp., et al. Order re stay)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes. (Frazer, T)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by T Roe Frazer, II on behalf of Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes (Frazer, T)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 T. Roe Frazer, II, Esq., leave to appear pro hoc vice as counsel for plaintiff...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/06/2019. (lam)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2858825 by Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes. (Church, Antonio)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Antonio B Church on behalf of Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes (Church, Antonio)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 defendants Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline; the referenced defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 60 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or to transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/23/2019. (lam)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 16, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2847836. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Canadian County District Court, case number CJ-2018-714 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 Summons, #6 Exhibit 6 Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 Summons, #8 Exhibit 8 Summons, #9 Exhibit 9 Summons, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons, #19 Exhibit 19 Docket, #20 Exhibit 20 Opinion - Acoma Pueblo v. The American Tobacco Co, #21 Exhibit 21 Opioid-related Indian tribe actions, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes v. Watson Laboratories Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne & Arapaho Tribes
Represented By: Antonio B Church
Represented By: T Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?