Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mario Mucciolo
Defendant: Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Jane Does, John Does and Bocacare
Case Number: 5:2019cv00044
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Docket Annotation: CASE: 5:19-cv-00044DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:19-cv-80185, filed 02/07/2019. (ac)
February 7, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case sent to the Southern District of Florida (ac)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/7/2019. (llg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Venue to Southern District of Florida by Mario Mucciolo. (ac)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo.(ac)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo. Plf is DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a First Amended Complaint which provides all of the missing jurisdictional information (as fully set out in this order). Plf is also DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a short notice to the court explaining any reason why this action should not be either dismissed or transferred, given the apparent lack of venue in this district. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/23/2019. (llg)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/17/19. (mc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Mucciolo. (ac)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Bocacare, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bocacare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Mucciolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?