Oklahoma City City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma City City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, MD Harvey Jenkins, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, MD Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, MD Lynn Webster, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, MD Russell Portenoy and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00076
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
March 21, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY by Plaintiff Oklahoma City City of re #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Oklahoma City City of. (Court, Todd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Oklahoma City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Regarding Remands [#130], #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Management Order [#232])(Court, Todd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO, #2 Exhibit Statement of Interest, #3 Exhibit Withdrawal)(Campbell, Stuart)
March 14, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 6, 2019 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corporation Amended. (Huntsman, Susan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 47 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Harvard Drug Group LLC The. (Ray, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 44 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 43 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cherokee Nation Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware OK Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Osage OK Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Portland ME Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - EDVA Stay Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - WDVA Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Stay Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ill. Stay Order 1, #15 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Deferral Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ariz. Partial Stay Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 21, 2019 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Oklahoma City City of. (Court, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond filed by Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc. Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's petition within 45 days of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/21/2019. (jb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Oklahoma City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Order - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Appearance. (Hemphill, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Hemphill, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's petition within 45 days of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/13/2019. (jb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #21 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. The Court additionally grants the Amended Motion as to the Manufacturer Defendants. The Janssen Defendants and the Manufacturer Defendants identified in Doc. No. 21-1 shall file their answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's petition within 45 days of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/13/2019. (jb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Return, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Entry, #6 Exhibit Entry, #7 Exhibit Entry, #8 Exhibit Motion, #9 Exhibit Order, #10 Exhibit Entry, #11 Exhibit Notice of Notice, #12 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc and #18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp as set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/07/2019. (jb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ridgeway, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Burns, Joshua)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/01/19. (wh)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/01/19. (wh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation (McBride, D)
January 29, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2854725. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-6179 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service Harvey Jenkins MD, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer of William Valuck DO, #6 Exhibit 6 - Entry of Appearance for Harvey Jenkins MD, #7 Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearance for AmeriSourceBergen Corp, #8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance for McKesson Corp, #9 Exhibit 9 - Special App and Mtn for Ext by McKesson Corp, Cardinal Health, AmeriSourceBergen Corp, #10 Exhibit 10 - Entry of Appearance for Cardinal Health Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 - Docket Sheet Oklahoma County, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma City City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Lisa R Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Lisa R Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma City City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?