United States of America v. Newman et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael D Kelly, First Bank & Trust Company, David P Newman and Tami S Rockwell
Case Number: 5:2019cv00095
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard G. Rose)(Rose, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Michael D Kelly (Sullivan, Kent)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael D Kelly.(Sullivan, Kent)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kent P Sullivan on behalf of Michael D Kelly (Sullivan, Kent)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Michael D Kelly served on 2/16/2019. (Rose, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. First Bank & Trust Company served on 2/20/2019. (Rose, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. David P Newman served on 2/16/2019. (Rose, Richard)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tami S Rockwell. (kmt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to First Bank & Trust Company, Michael D Kelly, David P Newman. (kmt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Bank & Trust Company, Michael D Kelly, David P Newman, Tami S Rockwell filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Warranty Deed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Newman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Kelly
Represented By: Kent P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami S Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard G Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?