Brown et al v. Fretzpark Homes Inc

Plaintiff: Shyquase K Jenkins, Rhonda D Rhone, Taquanna Z Gates and Ruchelle V Brown
Defendant: Fretzpark Homes Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00109
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Beau D Phillips on behalf of Fretzpark Homes Inc (Phillips, Beau)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christina F Cupp (Cupp, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Gooch v. Hudiburg Order, #2 Exhibit 2- Knightne v. Allstate Inc. Co., #3 Exhibit 3- Lane v. Page, #4 Exhibit 4-Holtzman v. B/E Aerospace, Inc., #5 Exhibit 5-Pavlik v. FDIC, #6 Exhibit 6- Birabent v. Hudiburg Auto Group, Inc., #7 Exhibit 7- Gibson v. Officemax, Inc., #8 Exhibit 8- Woodward v. Chesapeake Energy Mktg., #9 Exhibit 9- Palmer v. Oakland Farms, In., #10 Exhibit 10- Henson v. Supplemental Health Care Staffing Specialists, #11 Exhibit 11- United States v. Global Mortg. Funding, Inc.)(Richards, Kristin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 09:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 4/19/2019. (llg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Fretzpark Homes Inc . (Cupp, Christina)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Fretzpark Homes Inc.(Cupp, Christina)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Christina F Cupp on behalf of Fretzpark Homes Inc (Cupp, Christina)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruchelle V Brown, Shyquase K Jenkins, Taquanna Z Gates, Rhonda D Rhone. Fretzpark Homes Inc served on 2/7/2019. (Richards, Kristin)
February 5, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2858262. (Richards, Kristin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richards, Kristin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Fretzpark Homes Inc. (ac)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fretzpark Homes Inc filed by Ruchelle V Brown, Shyquase K Jenkins, Taquanna Z Gates, Rhonda D Rhone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Fretzpark Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shyquase K Jenkins
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda D Rhone
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taquanna Z Gates
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruchelle V Brown
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fretzpark Homes Inc
Represented By: Beau D Phillips
Represented By: Christina F Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?