Nootbaar v. Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc

Plaintiff: Martha K Nootbaar
Defendant: Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00110
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/8/2019; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 8/22/2019; Pla witness list due 8/22/2019; Pla exhibit list due 8/22/2019; Motions in limine due 10/162019; Jury instructions due 10/16/2019; Voir dire requests due 10/16/2019; Discovery due by 10/9/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 9/9/2019. Pretrial Report due by 10/16/2019.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/4/2019. (mb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Martha K Nootbaar. (Richards, Kristin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer by Martha K Nootbaar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Gooch v. Hudiburg Order, #2 Exhibit 2- Knightne v. Allstate Inc. Co., #3 Exhibit 3- Lane v. Page, #4 Exhibit 4- Wilson v. Lady Di Food Grps. Holding, LLC, #5 Exhibit 5- Smith v. Wal-Mart Stores, #6 Exhibit 6- Mattox v. Watson, #7 Exhibit 7- Telewizja Polska USA, Inc. v. EchoStar Satellite Corp., #8 Exhibit 8- Shirazi v. Childtime Learning Ctr., #9 Exhibit 9- Unicredit Bank AG v. Bucheli, #10 Exhibit 10- Birabent v. Hudiburg Auto Group, Inc., #11 Exhibit 11- Gibson v. Officemax, Inc., #12 Exhibit 12- Woodward v. Chesapeake Energy Mktg., #13 Exhibit 13- Henson v.Supplemental Health Care Staffing Specialists, #14 Exhibit 14- United States v. Global Mortg. Funding, Inc.)(Richards, Kristin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 02:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 4/1/2019. (mb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc . (Castro, Greg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc.(Castro, Greg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Greg A Castro on behalf of Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc (Castro, Greg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc (Shephard, C)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha K Nootbaar. Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc served on 2/6/2019. (Richards, Kristin)
February 5, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2858261. (Richards, Kristin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of Martha K Nootbaar (Hammons, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of Martha K Nootbaar (Richards, Kristin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc. (kmt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc filed by Martha K Nootbaar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nootbaar v. Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha K Nootbaar
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alderwoods Oklahoma Inc
Represented By: Greg A Castro
Represented By: C Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?