Mitts v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Francis Carol Mitts
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00117
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Complaint served on US Attorney on 3/18/19, filed by Plaintiff Francis Carol Mitts. (Troutman, Gayle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Complaint served on Attorney General on 3/21/19, filed by Plaintiff Francis Carol Mitts. (Troutman, Gayle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Francis Carol Mitts. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 3/18/2019. (Troutman, Gayle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (rmc)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 2/11/19. (mc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Darren Todd Rackley on behalf of Francis Carol Mitts (Rackley, Darren)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Gayle L Troutman on behalf of Francis Carol Mitts (Troutman, Gayle)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francis Carol Mitts. (em)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Francis Carol Mitts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitts v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Carol Mitts
Represented By: Gayle L Troutman
Represented By: Darren Todd Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?