Cooper v. Alva City of
Plaintiff: Jade A Cooper
Defendant: Alva City of
Case Number: 5:2019cv00148
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 Expert Witness List Non-Retained by Plaintiff Jade A Cooper. (Hurst, Amber)
September 17, 2019 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kristin Richards by Jade A Cooper. (Hurst, Amber)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Jade Cooper by Alva City of. (Gooch, Ambre)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Jade Cooper by Alva City of. (Gooch, Ambre)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 ENTER ORDER. The settlement conference was held on June 19, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. The case did not settle. Entered by direction of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/20/19. (lb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 23 ENTER ORDER. Settlement Conference RESET for 6/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in Room 1301 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Entered by direction of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/8/19. (lb) Modified on 5/15/2019 to change date from 2018 to 2019 (lb).
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Subpoena by Alva City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Subpoena)(Gooch, Ambre)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in Room 1301 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/6/19. (lb)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. This matter is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell for a settlement conference pursuant to LCvR 16.2. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/01/2019. (jb)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 09/20/2019; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 10/04/2019; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 10/04/2019; Dft exhibit list due 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 01/10/2020; Trial briefs due 01/10/2020; Discovery due by 12/4/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Motions due by 11/4/2019. Pretrial Report due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/01/2019. (jb)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY by Plaintiff Jade A Cooper re #13 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer filed by Jade A Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Snap! Mobile, Inc. v. Croghan, #2 Exhibit 2-ROC ASAP, L.L.C. v. Starnet Ins. Co., #3 Exhibit 3-United States v. Land O'Lakes, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4- Parker v. City of Tulsa, #5 Exhibit 5- Wilson v. Lady Di Food Grps.Holding, LLC, #6 Exhibit 6-Smith v. Mustang, #7 Exhibit 7- Burget v. Capital W. Sec., Inc., #8 Exhibit 8- Woodard v. Chesapeake Energy Mktg., #9 Exhibit 9- Gibson v. Officemax, Inc.)(Richards, Kristin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer filed by Alva City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franco v. Goodwill Shops, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rajala v. McGuire Woods, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ailey v. Midland Funding, #4 Exhibit 4 - Conocophillips v. Shaffer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Certifying Issue, #6 Exhibit 6 - Petition for Certiorari, #117854, #7 Exhibit 7 - Petition for Certiorari, #117882)(Miller, Jordan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jade A Cooper. (Richards, Kristin)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Defendant's Motion to Reset Status Conference. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 04/12/2019. (jb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw #12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Order to Reset Status Conference by Alva City of. (Gooch, Ambre)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer by Jade A Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- ADP Commer. Leasing, Inc. v. M.G. Santos, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2- Washington v. Integris Health, Inc., #3 Exhibit 3- Lucas v. Jerusalem Cafe, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4- Nixson v. Health Alliance, #5 Exhibit 5- Ulyssix Techs., Inc. v. Orbital Network Eng'g, Inc., #6 Exhibit 6- Topline Solutions, Inc. v. Sandler Sys., #7 Exhibit 7- Lane v. Page, #8 Exhibit 8- Wilson v. Lady Di Food Grps. Holding, LLC)(Richards, Kristin)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Order to Reset Status Conference by Alva City of. (Gooch, Ambre)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 01:00 PM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 4/24/2019. (jb)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan Louis Miller on behalf of Alva City of (Miller, Jordan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jade A Cooper. Alva City of served on 2/22/2019. (Richards, Kristin)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) by Alva City of Initial Disclosures (Gooch, Ambre)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alva City of.(Gooch, Ambre)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ambre C Gooch on behalf of Alva City of (Gooch, Ambre)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alva City of. (kmt)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Amber L Hurst on behalf of Jade A Cooper (Hurst, Amber)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of Jade A Cooper (Hammons, Mark)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of Jade A Cooper (Richards, Kristin)
February 18, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2866075. (Richards, Kristin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alva City of filed by Jade A Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Alva City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade A Cooper
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva City of
Represented By: Ambre C Gooch
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?