Droze et al v. Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jared Droze and Matthew Reyna
Defendant: Quartz Mountain Investment LLC, Mangum City Hospital Authority and Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00175
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Droze, Matthew Reyna. Quartz Mountain Investment LLC served on 4/17/2019. (Hurst, Amber)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Droze, Matthew Reyna. Mangum City Hospital Authority served on 4/15/2019. (Hurst, Amber)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mangum City Hospital Authority, Quartz Mountain Investment LLC. (kmt)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Droze, Matthew Reyna. Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC served on 3/4/2019. (Hurst, Amber)
February 25, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2869976. (Hurst, Amber)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC, Mangum City Hospital Authority, Quartz Mountain Investment LLC. (kmt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC, Mangum City Hospital Authority, Quartz Mountain Investment LLC filed by Jared Droze, Matthew Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Droze et al v. Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quartz Mountain Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mangum City Hospital Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Health Southwest Oklahoma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Droze
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Reyna
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?