Emergency Services of Oklahoma PC et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Oklahoma Emergency Services PC, South Central Emergency Services PC, Emergency Physicians of Mid-America PC and Emergency Services of Oklahoma PC
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services Inc and United HealthCare of Oklahoma Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00430
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Stalinski Declaration)(Colleluori, Donald)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #27 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Defendants' shall file their response to plaintiffs' Motion to Remand on or before Tuesday, July 2, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/26/2019. (ks)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Colleluori, Donald)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY by Defendants United HealthCare Services Inc, United HealthCare of Oklahoma Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. (Colleluori, Donald)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eckinger, Helen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Eckinger, Helen)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Larry B. Childs is admitted as counsel pro hac vice for Plaintiffs Emergency Services of Oklahoma, PC, Oklahoma Emergency Services, PC, Emergency services of Mid-America, PC, and South Central Emergency Services, PC. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/4/2019. (ks)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #23 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/4/2019. (ks)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Larry B. Childs Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2934840 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission LBC)(Sparks, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Ridgeway, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Donald Colleluori on behalf of United HealthCare Services Inc, United HealthCare of Oklahoma Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company (Colleluori, Donald)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Don Colleluori is temporarily admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of appearing in this case as counsel for Defendants, provided each attorney who has not previously registered for ECF submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/29/2019. (ks)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Helen L. Eckinger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eckinger, Helen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew G Jubinsky on behalf of United HealthCare Services Inc, United HealthCare of Oklahoma Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company (Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Helen L. Eckinger is temporarily admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of appearing in this case as counsel for Plaintiffs, provided each attorney who has not previously registered for ECF submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/22/2019. (ks)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Helen L. Eckinger Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2926971 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission HLE)(Sparks, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by South Central Emergency Services PC . (Sparks, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Oklahoma Emergency Services PC . (Sparks, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Emergency Physicians of Mid-America PC . (Sparks, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Emergency Services of Oklahoma PC . (Sparks, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sparks, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ridgeway, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin H Odom on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Odom, Benjamin)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Andrew G. Jubinsky is temporarily admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of appearing in this case as counsel for Defendants, provided each attorney who has not previously registered for ECF submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/21/2019. (ks)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Donald Colleluori Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2926183 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission_Colleluori)(Barrow, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -Andrew Jubinsky Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2926179 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission_Jubinsky)(Barrow, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Chief Judge Joe Heaton is no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/21/2019. (lam)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Joe Heaton recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/21/2019. (lam)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Barrow, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Barrow, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of All Defendants (Barrow, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2920321. (Barrow, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cleveland County District Court, case number CJ-2019-482 filed by United HealthCare of Oklahoma Inc, United HealthCare Services Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-Declaration 2, #3 Exhibit 3-State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4-Petition, #5 Exhibit 5-Proof of Service_United Healthcare of Okla, #6 Exhibit 6-Proof of Service_United Healthcare of Okla_Okla Insur Comm, #7 Exhibit 7-Proof of Service_United Healthcare Insur Co, #8 Exhibit 8-Proof of Service_United Healthcare Services, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergency Services of Oklahoma PC et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Emergency Services PC
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Helen L. Eckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Central Emergency Services PC
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Helen L. Eckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Physicians of Mid-America PC
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Helen L. Eckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Services of Oklahoma PC
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Benjamin H Odom
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Helen L. Eckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher A Barrow
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services Inc
Represented By: Christopher A Barrow
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare of Oklahoma Inc
Represented By: Christopher A Barrow
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?