Hernandez v. Cope et al
Plaintiff: Olga Hernandez
Defendant: Great West Casualty and Jerrod Malek Cope
Case Number: 5:2019cv00436
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 12:00 PM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 7/31/2019. (jb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Strike #6 Response to Motion filed by Olga Hernandez. (Dunn, Lambert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Great West Casualty . (Taremi, Mehry)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #6 Response to Motion by Great West Casualty. (Taremi, Mehry)
May 27, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Olga Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from opposing counsel)(Dunn, Lambert)
May 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Lambert D Dunn, Jr on behalf of Olga Hernandez (Dunn, Lambert)
May 15, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2923005. (Taremi, Mehry)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Great West Casualty. (Taremi, Mehry)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Great West Casualty (Taremi, Mehry)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Great West Casualty (Jones, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-2352 filed by Great West Casualty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dkt Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Cope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty
Represented By: Daniel K Jones
Represented By: Mehry Taremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Malek Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Hernandez
Represented By: Lambert D Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?