Crain v. Cyprus Mines Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Crain
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Johnson & Johnson and Cyprus Mines Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00438
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Replies due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/2/2019. (md)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Ward, Jeremy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Sharon Crain. (Simon, Dana)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 EMAIL from Courtroom Deputy Marcia J. Davis to Oklahoma State Attorney General.(md)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Notice (other) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. The Oklahoma State Attorney General is granted leave to intervene within 60 days after the filing of Defendant's Notice, or by August 24, 2019. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Certification to the Oklahoma Attorney General. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 6/26/2019. (md)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE (other) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc of Constitutional Challenge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- [Doc. 16] Answer of Defendants J&J and JJCI to Plaintiff's Original Complaint)(Maloan, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE (other) by Sharon Crain Notice of Filing of Opposition to Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy Under 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) and 1334(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to J&J Motion to Fix Venue, #2 Exhibit Sur-Reply in Opposition to J&J's Motion to Fix Venue)(Simon, Dana)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sharon Crain. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification of Dana Simon, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Imerys and Cyprus First Supp Interrogatories Alderdice, #4 Exhibit Mathieu is J&J source, #5 Exhibit Donald Ferry deposition, #6 Exhibit 1989 Purchase Agreement, #7 Exhibit 1989 Talc Supply Agreement, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Alexandra Picard)(Simon, Dana)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #21 Response to Motion, STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. (md)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 STRICKEN RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sharon Crain. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification of Dana Simon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Simon, Dana) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 6/25/2019 (md).
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Sharon Crain for Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant Johnson & Johnson's First Interrogatories (Simon, Dana)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE (other) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc of Filing of Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy Under 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) and 1334(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy)(Maloan, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc . (Maloan, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Johnson & Johnson . (Maloan, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(Maloan, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael T Maloan on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc (Maloan, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc (Ottaway, Larry)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy K Ward on behalf of Cyprus Mines Corporation (Ward, Jeremy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of John Fenn)(Walker-Abdoveis, Jill)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Jill J Walker-Abdoveis on behalf of Cyprus Mines Corporation (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Crain. Johnson & Johnson served on 5/20/2019. (Meyer, Henry)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Crain. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc served on 5/20/2019. (Meyer, Henry)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Crain. Cyprus Mines Corporation served on 5/17/2019. (Meyer, Henry)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Sharon Crain of Plaintiff's Discovery Documents (Simon, Dana)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Sharon Crain for Plaintiff's Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Sharon Crain For Use In Evidence (Simon, Dana)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Dana Casselli Simon on behalf of Sharon Crain (Simon, Dana)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 5/28/2019. (md)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dana Simon Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2925314 by Sharon Crain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana Simon)(Meyer, Henry)
May 13, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2921127. (Meyer, Henry)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cyprus Mines Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (rb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cyprus Mines Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc filed by Sharon Crain. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Evaluation Summary of James Robb MD, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/13/2019) (rb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain v. Cyprus Mines Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Crain
Represented By: Henry A Meyer, III
Represented By: Dana C Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Jill J Walker-Abdoveis
Represented By: Jeremy K Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?