Wesco Insurance Company v. Citizens Bankshares Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Defendant: Citizens Bankshares Inc, The Citizens State Bank and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp
Case Number: 5:2019cv00477
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion for Court-Ordered Mediation. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/12/2019. (md)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION for Order (Court-Ordered Mediation) by All Defendants. (Merchant, Samuel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan B Gatewood on behalf of Wesco Insurance Company (Gatewood, Evan)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Answer due September 6, 2019. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 6/14/2019. (md)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Citizens State Bank . (Lauderdale, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp . (Lauderdale, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Citizens Bankshares Inc . (Lauderdale, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint] by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waiver of Service)(Lauderdale, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel J Merchant on behalf of All Defendants (Merchant, Samuel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T Luttrell, III on behalf of All Defendants (Luttrell, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer F Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Spencer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Lauderdale on behalf of All Defendants (Lauderdale, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendants Citizens Bankshares Inc, The Citizens State Bank. Citizens Bankshares Inc waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; The Citizens State Bank waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Gatewood, Evan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp, Citizens Bankshares Inc, The Citizens State Bank. (rb)
May 28, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2929440. (Gatewood, Evan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp, Citizens Bankshares Inc, The Citizens State Bank filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2.9.2018 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco Insurance Company v. Citizens Bankshares Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bankshares Inc
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Samuel J Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Citizens State Bank
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Samuel J Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Samuel J Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan B Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?