Goeller v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joy R Goeller
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00491
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (lb)
July 17, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2960275. (Saunders, Kyle)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #2 of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell and denies #5 plaintiff's application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees and costs #2 and orders plaintiff to pay the full $400 filing fee within 21 days from the date of this order ; plaintiff is advised that is she does not pay the full $400 filing fee within 21 days of the date of this order this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/17/2019. (lam)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joy R Goeller. The undersigned recommends the court deny Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/19/19. (lb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 REPLY by Plaintiff Joy R Goeller re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joy R Goeller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- financial information)(Saunders, Kyle)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must supplement her sworn application on or before 6/19/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/29/19. (lb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joy R Goeller. (rb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Joy R Goeller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goeller v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy R Goeller
Represented By: Kyle J Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?