Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC v. Plains Medical LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC
Defendant: Jeff Beard and Plains Medical LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00514
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC. Jeff Beard served on 7/11/2019. (Linscott, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC . (Linscott, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER (Text Only)- A review of the filings in this case reveals that Plaintiff Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC and Defendant Plains Medical LLC have not filed Corporate Disclosure Statements in compliance with Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiff Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC and Defendant Plains Medical LLC to file within 7 days of this order their respective Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Rule 7.1, using the form available on the Courts website (http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/wpcontent/uploads/Corporate_Disclosure_Form.pdf).(This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 7/8/2019. (ks)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Karen L Hart on behalf of Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC (Hart, Karen)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Karen Lynn Hart is hereby admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case, provided counsel submits and ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/12/2019. (ks)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karen Lynn Hart Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2939761 by Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Linscott, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael S Linscott on behalf of Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC (Linscott, Michael)
June 6, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2936268. (Linscott, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Beard, Plains Medical LLC. (kmt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeff Beard, Plains Medical LLC filed by Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease (Papa Murphys) EXECUTED 7-25-2016, #2 Exhibit 2 - Guaranty, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018-7-5 - Notice to Tenant, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018-11-2 - Notice of Default, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2019-11-19 - Notice to Quit, #6 Exhibit 6 - Confidential Settlement and Payout Agreement - EXECUTED, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC v. Plains Medical LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Plaza Capital Venture LLC
Represented By: Michael S Linscott
Represented By: Karen L Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?