Scuderi v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Scuderi, Vincent Furia, Stephen Terry, Andrew Micklin, Sharon Furia, Justas Normantas, Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund, Daniel Furia and Dion Larot
Defendant: Arty Straehla, Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc and Keith Ellison
Case Number: 5:2019cv00522
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ~ re #87 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Defendants Mammoth Energy, Straehla, and Layton shall file their response to Plaintiffs' motion within 10 days, or no later than March 6, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 2/25/2020. (dwl)
February 24, 2020 Filing 89 DECLARATION by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia re #88 Memorandum in Opposition . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Block, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2020 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Block, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Redline))(Block, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2020 Filing 86 ENTRY of Appearance by William J Leone on behalf of Keith Ellison (Leone, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 85 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan B Baum on behalf of Keith Ellison (Baum, Nathan)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ~ Granting #81 , #82 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nathan B. Baum and William J. Leone are hereby admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/29/2020. (dwl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 83 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Out of Time by Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hampton, Joe)
January 27, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William J. Leone Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3083448 by Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hampton, Joe)
January 24, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan B. Baum Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3082204 by Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hampton, Joe)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ~ Denying #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Local counsel is cautioned that the Court will not tolerate pleadings which do not conform to local and federal rules and which do not meet the standards expected of counsel practicing in this Court. If Defendant Ellison wishes to submit another motion to file an answer or response out of time, he may do so no later than January 30, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/23/2020. (dwl)
January 22, 2020 Filing 79 ENTRY of Appearance by Johnny R Blassingame, Jr on behalf of Keith Ellison (Blassingame, Johnny)
January 22, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #55 Amended Complaint by Keith Ellison. (Hampton, Joe)
January 22, 2020 Filing 77 ENTRY of Appearance by Joe M Hampton on behalf of Keith Ellison (Hampton, Joe)
January 10, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF HARRY A. OLIVAR, JR. IN SUPPORT, #2 Exhibit 1 June 5, 2019 Wall Street Journal Article, #3 Exhibit 2 Mammoth Mar. 15, 2019 Form 10-K, #4 Exhibit 3 Cobra Admin. Motion, #5 Exhibit 4 Mammoth Jan. 31, 2018 Form 8-K, #6 Exhibit 5 Mammoth Nov. 1, 2017 Form S-3, #7 Exhibit 6 SEC Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 7 May 29, 2018 SEC Letter, #9 Exhibit 8 Nov. 6, 2017 CNN Article, #10 Exhibit 9 Mammoth Nov. 13, 2017 10-Q, #11 Exhibit 10 Ex. 10.3 to Mammoth Nov. 13, 2017 10-Q, #12 Exhibit 11 Feb. 22, 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #13 Appendix 1 - Statement Chart)(Olivar, Harry)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ~ Granting #73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Per the parties agreement, the opening and response briefs page limits are expanded to thirty-pages. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/10/2020. (dwl)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ~ Granting #72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael B. Carlinsky is hereby admitted to practice beforethis Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case, provided counsel submits an ECFregistration form and files an entry of appearance. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/10/2020. (dwl)
January 9, 2020 Filing 73 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /Oversized Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (Leffel, Lance)
January 9, 2020 Docket Annotation: PAYMENT for Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filing fee $50.00, receipt number 1087-3070571 re #72 MOTION by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (ank)
January 8, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of MICHAEL B. CARLINSKY by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Leffel, Lance)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Bernard Jones for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/6/20. (md)
December 30, 2019 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Furia, Daniel Furia, Vincent Furia. Keith Ellison served on 12/14/2019. (Copeland, C)
December 5, 2019 Filing 69 ENTRY of Appearance by Harry A Olivar, Jr on behalf of Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla (Olivar, Harry)
December 5, 2019 Filing 68 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob J Waldman on behalf of Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla (Waldman, Jacob)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael F Lauderdale; Michelle A Reed; Spencer F Smith; M Scott Barnard and Erin M Brewer terminated. Attorneys Harry A. Olivar and Jacob J. Waldman are directed to file their entries of appearance within 5 days of the date of this Order. Attorney Michael B. Carlinsky has not yet been admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/5/2019. (md)
December 4, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (Smith, Spencer)
December 3, 2019 Filing 65 Receipt for Money Received from Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla in the amount of $50.00, receipt number 1087-3046407 regarding #63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Harry Olivar, Jr. (rb)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Harry Olivar, Jr. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/3/2019. (md)
December 3, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Harry Olivar, Jr. by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harry Olivar, Jr.)(McCampbell, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Waldman. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/3/2019. (md)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mark Layton answer due 1/10/2020; Mammoth Energy Services Inc answer due 1/10/2020; Arty Straehla answer due 1/10/2020. Plaintiffs shall file a response to any motion to dismiss, if such motion is filed by Defendants, within forty-five days after the motion is filed; and Defendants shall file their reply, if any, within 30 days. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/3/2019. (md)
December 2, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Waldman Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3046425 by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Waldman)(McCampbell, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 59 ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla (Leffel, Lance)
December 2, 2019 Filing 58 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla (McCampbell, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 57 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, Or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (McCampbell, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Filing 56 Summons Issued Electronically as to Keith Ellison. (rb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla, Keith Ellison filed by Sharon Furia, Daniel Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indictment)(Block, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas Scuderi (Kim, Phillip)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER directing Clerk to strike #50 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/17/2019. (md)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Phillip Kim filed by Thomas Scuderi as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/17/2019. (md)
October 17, 2019 Filing 51 ENTER ORDER The Docket includes as Plaintiffs in this action, the following individuals: Stephen Terry, Andrew Micklin and Dion Larot. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike these individuals as Plaintiffs as they are not identified in any of the Complaints filed in thisaction prior to the consolidation. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/17/2019. (md)
October 17, 2019 Filing 50 STRICKEN ORDER. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/17/2019. (md) Pursuant to Order #53 entered on 10/17/2019 (md).
October 10, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Phillip Kim by Thomas Scuderi. (Kim, Phillip)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., is advised thatthey must associate with local counsel pursuant to LCvR 83.3 and local counsel shall file an entry of appearance within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/10/2019. (md)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Withdraw Attorney William B. Federman. Attorney William B Federman terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/10/2019. (md)
September 25, 2019 Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Morgan Taylor Lee Smith on behalf of Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia (Smith, Morgan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER the law firm of Jones, Gotcher & Bogan, P.C., is appointed as local counsel for Lead Plaintiff, the Furia Family. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/25/2019. (md)
September 19, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Copeland, C)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #43 Declaration STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to comply with Order #41 regarding how all future filings should be styled. Counsel is directed to refile their Declaration in accordance with the directives in the Order #41 . (md)
September 18, 2019 Filing 43 STRICKEN DECLARATION by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia re #41 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Resume of Local Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Counsel Resume)(Colvin, Patrick) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 9/19/2019 (md).
September 18, 2019 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick G Colvin on behalf of Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia (Colvin, Patrick)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER The three actions identified in the case caption of this Order are consolidated for all pretrial proceedings and for trial as more fully set forth herein. the Court finds #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases is DENIED AS MOOT based on the filing of the Notice of Withdrawal #31 ; #22 Motion to Consolidate Cases is GRANTED except that the Court defers ruling on appointment of local counsel and directs the Furia Family to submit appropriate information to demonstrate the qualifications of local counsel within five days of the date of this Order; #23 Motion to Consolidate Cases is GRANTED to the extent the Motion requests consolidation of these matters and is DENIED as to all other requested relief. Further, the following SCHEDULING DEADLINES are established: a) within sixty days of the date of this Order, Block & Leviton LLP on behalf of the Furia Family as Lead Plaintiff, shall file a consolidated amended complaint; b) Defendants shall have forty five days to answer or otherwise respond to the allegations of the consolidated amended complaint; c) The Furia Family, as Lead Plaintiff, shall file a response to any motion to dismiss, if such motion is filed by Defendants, within forty-five days after the motion is filed; and d) Defendants shall file their reply, if any, to the Furia Familys response within thirty days after such response, if any, is filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this Order in Scuderi, Case No. CIV-19-522-SLP, Normantas, Case No. CIV-19-560-SLP and Sarasota, Case No. CIV-19-720-SLP. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/13/2019. (md)
September 4, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney William B. Federman by Thomas Scuderi. (Federman, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY by Defendants Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Appointment of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Daniel Furia, #2 Affidavit - Sharon Furia, #3 Affidavit - Vincent Furia)(Walker, Jacob)
September 3, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY by Plaintiff Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund. (Berg, Ian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Atara Hirsch on behalf of Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund (Hirsch, Atara)
August 28, 2019 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell M Z Twersky on behalf of Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund (Twersky, Mitchell)
August 27, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION by Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund re #34 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Ian D. Berg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sentencing Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Background Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Press Releases, #4 Exhibit 4 - Loss Chart)(Berg, Ian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) be Appointed Lead Plaintiff; and (3) Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel, #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Appointment of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund. (Berg, Ian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Ian D Berg on behalf of Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund (Berg, Ian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Walker, Jacob)
August 27, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE (other) by Dion Larot, Andrew Micklin, Justas Normantas, Thomas Scuderi, Stephen Terry re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) be Appointed Lead Plaintiff; and (3) Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion] (Federman, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey C Block on behalf of Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia (Block, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob A Walker on behalf of Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia (Walker, Jacob)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Block; granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob A. Walker. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/22/2019. (md)
August 22, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob A. Walker Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2983200 by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Copeland, C)
August 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Block Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2983190 by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Copeland, C)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION by Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Approval of Selection of Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - AFT Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - TLF Resume)(Tawwater, Darren)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund. (Tawwater, Darren)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Approval of Selection of Counsel by Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund. (Tawwater, Darren)
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Appointment of Lead and Local Counsel by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jacob A. Walker ni Support of the Furia Family's Motion for Consolidation of Cases; Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs; and Appointment of Lead and Local Counsel)(Copeland, C)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by C Michael Copeland on behalf of Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia (Copeland, C)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION by Dion Larot, Andrew Micklin, Justas Normantas, Thomas Scuderi, Stephen Terry re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) be Appointed Lead Plaintiff; and (3) Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel, #19 Brief, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certifications, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit 5 - F&S Firm Resume)(Federman, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) be Appointed Lead Plaintiff; and (3) Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel by Dion Larot, Andrew Micklin, Justas Normantas, Thomas Scuderi, Stephen Terry. (Federman, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; (2) be Appointed Lead Plaintiff; and (3) Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel by Thomas Scuderi, Justas Normantas, Stephen Terry, Andrew Micklin, Dion Larot. (Federman, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle A Reed on behalf of All Defendants (Reed, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Erin M Brewer on behalf of All Defendants (Brewer, Erin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by M Scott Barnard on behalf of All Defendants (Barnard, M)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/2/2019. (md) (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/2/2019) (md).
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [re Scott Barnard] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2951285 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1__W.D.Okla-Pro Hac Vice Request - Scott Barnard (Scuderi)_FLAT)(Smith, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [re Michelle Reed] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2951280 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1__W.D.Okla-Pro Hac Vice Request - Michelle Reed (Scuderi)_FLAT)(Smith, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [re Erin Brewer] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2951267 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1__W.D.Okla-Pro Hac Vice Request - Erin Brewer (Scuderi)_FLAT)(Smith, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set Filing and Briefing Schedule. Defendants deadline to file an Answer or other responsive pleading is STAYED until further order of the Court. The Court DEFERS ruling on any other requested relief and DECLINES to issue any scheduling order in this matter until the Court has ruled on the issues of consolidation and appointment of lead plaintiff(s) and lead counsel to represent the putative class. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/1/2019. (md)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time [to Respond to Complaint and to Set Filing and Briefing Schedule] by All Defendants. (Smith, Spencer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Lauderdale on behalf of All Defendants (Lauderdale, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer F Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Spencer)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Scuderi. Mammoth Energy Services Inc served on 6/10/2019. (Federman, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Phillip Kim on behalf of Thomas Scuderi (Kim, Phillip)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 6/10/2019. (md)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip Kim Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2938098 by Thomas Scuderi. (Federman, William)
June 7, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2937661. (Federman, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (rb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla filed by Thomas Scuderi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scuderi v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arty Straehla
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Erin M Brewer
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Jacob J Waldman
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Represented By: Harry A Olivar, Jr
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Layton
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Erin M Brewer
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Jacob J Waldman
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Represented By: Harry A Olivar, Jr
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Erin M Brewer
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Jacob J Waldman
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Represented By: Harry A Olivar, Jr
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Johnny R Blassingame, Jr
Represented By: William J Leone
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: Nathan B Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Scuderi
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Furia
Represented By: C Michael Copeland
Represented By: Morgan Taylor Lee Smith
Represented By: Patrick G Colvin
Represented By: Jeffrey C Block
Represented By: Jacob A Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Terry
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Micklin
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Furia
Represented By: C Michael Copeland
Represented By: Morgan Taylor Lee Smith
Represented By: Patrick G Colvin
Represented By: Jeffrey C Block
Represented By: Jacob A Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justas Normantas
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph A Hood, II
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarasota Gen. Pension Fund
Represented By: Ian D Berg
Represented By: Darren M Tawwater
Represented By: Mitchell M Z Twersky
Represented By: Atara Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Furia
Represented By: C Michael Copeland
Represented By: Morgan Taylor Lee Smith
Represented By: Patrick G Colvin
Represented By: Jeffrey C Block
Represented By: Jacob A Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Larot
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?