Allen et al v. Clinton HMA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Allen and Chase Allen
Defendant: Clinton HMPN LLC, Stacey D Knapp, Clinton HMA LLC, Victor L Fey and Michael C Hensley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00527
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander C Vosler on behalf of Clinton HMA LLC (Vosler, Alexander)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua W Anderson on behalf of Clinton HMA LLC (Anderson, Joshua)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Lewis, Caroline)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline J Lewis on behalf of Clinton HMPN LLC, Michael C Hensley (Lewis, Caroline)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by John E Wiggins on behalf of Clinton HMPN LLC, Michael C Hensley (Wiggins, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilton H Walters on behalf of Victor L Fey (Walters, Hilton)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Kanton B Vaverka on behalf of Victor L Fey (Vaverka, Kanton)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Allen(Individually), Brittany Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor), Chase Allen(Individually), Chase Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor). Victor L Fey served on 7/3/2019. (Brooks, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Allen(Individually), Brittany Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor), Chase Allen(Individually), Chase Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor). Stacey D Knapp served on 7/3/2019. (Brooks, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Allen(Individually), Brittany Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor), Chase Allen(Individually), Chase Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor). Clinton HMPN LLC served on 7/3/2019. (Brooks, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Allen(Individually), Brittany Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor), Chase Allen(Individually), Chase Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor). Michael C Hensley served on 7/3/2019. (Brooks, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Allen(Individually), Brittany Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor), Chase Allen(Individually), Chase Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor). Clinton HMA LLC served on 7/3/2019. (Brooks, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Clinton HMA LLC, Clinton HMPN LLC, Victor L Fey, Michael C Hensley, Stacey D Knapp. (nv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Emily S Eleftherakis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eleftherakis, Emily)
June 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2938171. (Brooks, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clinton HMA LLC, Clinton HMPN LLC, Victor L Fey, Michael C Hensley, Stacey D Knapp filed by Brittany Allen(Individually), Brittany Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor), Chase Allen(Individually), Chase Allen(As Parent and Next of Kin of Kambry Allen, a deceased minor). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Clinton HMA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton HMPN LLC
Represented By: Caroline J Lewis
Represented By: John E Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey D Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton HMA LLC
Represented By: Joshua W Anderson
Represented By: Alexander C Vosler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor L Fey
Represented By: Kanton B Vaverka
Represented By: Hilton H Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C Hensley
Represented By: Caroline J Lewis
Represented By: John E Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Allen
Represented By: Debra A Brooks
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Represented By: Emily S Eleftherakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Allen
Represented By: Debra A Brooks
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Represented By: Emily S Eleftherakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?