Gomez v. Oklahoma City Community College et al
Plaintiff: Denise Gomez
Defendant: Marlene Shugart, Oklahoma City Community College and Marlene Landini
Case Number: 5:2019cv00556
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Marlene Landini and Oklahoma City Community College answers due 8/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/16/2019. (jb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint by Marlene Landini, Oklahoma City Community College. (Bruce, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oklahoma City Community College, Marlene Shugart filed by Denise Gomez.(Haupt, Shannon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 11:20 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 8/28/2019. (jb)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 07/24/2019. (jb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Two (2) Weeks by Denise Gomez. (Leonard, Jana)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OCCC Family and Medical Leave Act Leave)(Whatley, Nathan)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before July 3, 2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 06/27/2019. (jb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by All Defendants. (Bruce, Philip)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip R Bruce on behalf of Marlene Shugart (Bruce, Philip)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Marlene Shugart (Whatley, Nathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip R Bruce on behalf of Oklahoma City Community College (Bruce, Philip)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Oklahoma City Community College (Whatley, Nathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oklahoma City Community College (Whatley, Nathan)
June 19, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2944128. (Whatley, Nathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-2962 filed by Oklahoma City Community College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Oklahoma City Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Shugart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma City Community College
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Represented By: Philip R Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Landini
Represented By: Philip R Bruce
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Gomez
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?