Wilson v. Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC
Plaintiff: William T Wilson
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00557
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 EMAIL from Courtroom Deputy Marcia Davis to Oklahoma State Attorney General (md).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Notice (other) filed by Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC. The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to provide to the Oklahoma Attorney General a copy of this Order, a copy of Defendants Notice of Constitutional Challenge with the exhibit thereto [6 and 6-1], and a copy of the Courts docket sheet in this action as it now stands. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/10/2019. (md)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 09:45 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 8/29/2019. (md)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC . (Maloan, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC of Constitutional Challenge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Answer of Defendant)(Maloan, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by David L Butler on behalf of William T Wilson (Butler, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley M Thul on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC (Thul, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Bowman on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC (Bowman, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael T Maloan on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC (Maloan, Michael)
June 19, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2944154. (Maloan, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for Comanche County, case number CJ-2019-290 filed by Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Served Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer 6-12-19, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Alisha Boring - signed, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Bowman
Represented By: Ashley M Thul
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T Wilson
Represented By: David L Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?