Normantas v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Justas Normantas
Defendant: Mark Layton, Arty Straehla, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Vincent Furia, Daniel Furia and Sharon Furia
Case Number: 5:2019cv00560
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Appointment of Lead and Local Counsel by Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jacob A. Walker in Support of the Furia Family's Motion for (1) Consolidation of Cases; (2) Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs; and (3) Appointment of Lead and Local Counsel)(Copeland, C)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by C Michael Copeland on behalf of Daniel Furia, Sharon Furia, Vincent Furia (Copeland, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle A Reed on behalf of All Defendants (Reed, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Erin M Brewer on behalf of All Defendants (Brewer, Erin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by M Scott Barnard on behalf of All Defendants (Barnard, M)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/2/2019. (md)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [re Scott Barnard] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2951304 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1__W.D.Okla-Pro Hac Vice Request - Scott Barnard (Normantas)_FLAT)(Smith, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [re Michelle Reed] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2951298 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1__W.D.Okla-Pro Hac Vice Request - Michelle Reed (Normantas)_FLAT)(Smith, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [re Erin Brewer] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2951293 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1__W.D.Okla-Pro Hac Vice Request - Erin Brewer (Normantas)_FLAT)(Smith, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set Filing and Brief Schedule. Defendants deadline to file an Answer or other responsive pleading is STAYED until further order of the Court. The Court DEFERS ruling on any other requested relief and DECLINES to issue any scheduling order in this matter until the Court has ruled on the issues of consolidation and appointment of lead plaintiff(s) and lead counsel to represent the putative class. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/1/2019. (md)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick V Dahlstrom on behalf of Justas Normantas (Dahlstrom, Patrick)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph A Hood, II on behalf of Justas Normantas (Hood, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy A Lieberman on behalf of Justas Normantas (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time [to Respond to Complaint and to Set Filing and Briefing Schedule] by All Defendants. (Smith, Spencer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Lauderdale on behalf of All Defendants (Lauderdale, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer F Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Spencer)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 6/26/2019. (md)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Patrick V. Dahlstrom] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2948250 by Justas Normantas. (Federman, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [J. Alexander Hood II] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2948249 by Justas Normantas. (Federman, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Jeremy A. Lieberman] Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2948244 by Justas Normantas. (Federman, William)
June 20, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2944697. (Federman, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (rb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla filed by Justas Normantas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Normantas v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justas Normantas
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joseph A Hood, II
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Layton
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Erin M Brewer
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arty Straehla
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Erin M Brewer
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: Erin M Brewer
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Michael F Lauderdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Furia
Represented By: C Michael Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Furia
Represented By: C Michael Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Furia
Represented By: C Michael Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?