Allen v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cody Allen
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Respondent: Ginnie Mae, Department of Veterans Affairs, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Sun West Mortgage Corporation Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA, united States Department of Treasury, Cody A Brewer, Baer & Timberlake PC and Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Case Number: 5:2019cv00563
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cody Allen. Freedom Mortgage Corporation served on 7/3/2019. (rb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER this action is remanded to the District Court of Oklahoma County as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/11/2019. (md)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alex M Sharp (Sharp, Alex)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Alex M Sharp on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Sharp, Alex)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (rb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Cody Allen in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500074648 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (rb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-852 filed by Cody Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Index od Documents Filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit 4- Certificate of Mailing for Demurrer, #5 Exhibit 5-Defendant Relators Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Petition to Foreclose, #6 Exhibit 6- Plaintiff Relators Crossclaim,Counterclaim, Complaint in Equity, #7 Exhibit 7- Lis Pendens, #8 Exhibit 8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account8- Request for Cash Collateral Account, #9 Exhibit 9- Application for TRO, #10 Exhibit 10- Plaintiff Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time, #11 Exhibit 11- Relators Response to Respondents Motion for Extension of Time, #12 Exhibit 12- Amended Petition for Default Judgment, #13 Exhibit 13- Order Granting Motion for Extension, #14 Exhibit 14- Entry of Appearance, #15 Exhibit 15- Plaintiffs Respondents Combined Reply, Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ginnie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sun West Mortgage Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: united States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cody A Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Baer & Timberlake PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Alex M Sharp
Represented By: William H Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?