Callen Properties LLC v. Callen et al
Plaintiff: Callen Properties LLC
Defendant: Nick Callen, Mark Wesner, Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC, Joseph Seth Callen, Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA, Clinton Ray Birchell, United States of America and Devils Claw Ranch LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00601
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Callen Properties LLC.(Lee, Jon)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 AGREED ORDER plaintiff and the government have reached an agreement as to the motion #12 and objections thereto #13 ...plaintiff will amend the petition/complaint within 30 days of this order...upon filing of the amended complaint motion #12 of the government will be moot; if plaintiff fails to amend the complaint within 30 days this cause of action against the government will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/01/2019. (lam)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lee, Jon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Clay Combs, FSA Farm Loan Specialist)(Sewell, Kay)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon T Lee on behalf of Callen Properties LLC (Lee, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle N Eastwood on behalf of Clinton Ray Birchell (Eastwood, Kyle)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Erin J Rooney on behalf of Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA (Rooney, Erin)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley A Gungoll on behalf of Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA (Gungoll, Bradley)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan L Dean on behalf of Mark Wesner, Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC (Dean, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin D Meek on behalf of Mark Wesner, Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC (Meek, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for the parties to file their entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 07/08/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/03/2019. (lam)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (other) by United States of America of No Pending Motions (Sewell, Kay)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kiowa County District Court, case number CJ-2018-28 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Third Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons, #3 Exhibit 3-St Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callen Properties LLC v. Callen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Callen
Represented By: M Monty Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wesner
Represented By: Ryan L Dean
Represented By: Justin D Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC
Represented By: Ryan L Dean
Represented By: Justin D Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Seth Callen
Represented By: M Monty Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA
Represented By: Patrick T Cornell
Represented By: Erin J Rooney
Represented By: Bradley A Gungoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Ray Birchell
Represented By: Barry P Squires
Represented By: Kyle N Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kay D Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devils Claw Ranch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callen Properties LLC
Represented By: Jon T Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?