Columbus Life Insurance Company v. DB 231 Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Columbus Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Fictitious Entities, J Ted Bonham, John B Nye, Jr, David Blackburn, DB 231 Holdings LLC and Phil & Donna Gray Trust Dated May 5, 2004
Case Number: 5:2019cv00612
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John B Nye, Jr answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/22/2019. (jb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by John B Nye, Jr. (Lee, Jim)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by John B Nye, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lee, Jim)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jim W Lee (Lee, Jim)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Jim W Lee on behalf of John B Nye, Jr (Lee, Jim)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Phil & Donna Gray Trust Dated May 5, 2004. (ank)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fictitious Entities, John B Nye, Jr, Phil & Donna Gray Trust Dated May 5, 2004 filed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 01 Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - 09 Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loan Acknowledgement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Annual Reports, #5 Exhibit 5 - 10/08/18 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - 01/22/19 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - 01/22/19 Request, #8 Exhibit 8 - 02/11/19 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - 04/01/19 Letter)(Walters, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Columbus Life Insurance Company (Walters, Jason)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 11:20 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 9/25/2019. (jb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. John B Nye, Jr served on 7/13/2019. (Threlkeld, C)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. J Ted Bonham served on 7/11/2019. (Threlkeld, C)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. David Blackburn served on 7/11/2019. (Threlkeld, C)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. DB 231 Holdings LLC served on 7/11/2019. (Threlkeld, C)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A Walters on behalf of Columbus Life Insurance Company (Walters, Jason)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Walters shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before July 25, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 07/11/2019. (jb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Columbus Life Insurance Company . (Threlkeld, C)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason Allen Walters Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2955925 by Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Threlkeld, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to David Blackburn, J Ted Bonham, DB 231 Holdings LLC, John B Nye, Jr. (ank)
July 9, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2955125. (Threlkeld, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by C William Threlkeld on behalf of Columbus Life Insurance Company (Threlkeld, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Blackburn, J Ted Bonham, DB 231 Holdings LLC, Fictitious Entities, John B Nye, Jr filed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 01 Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - 09 Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loan Ack Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Annual Reports, #5 Exhibit 5 - 10-08-18 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - 01-22-19 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - Statement Req, #8 Exhibit 8 - 02-11-19 Letter and Statement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter and Checks, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbus Life Insurance Company v. DB 231 Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ted Bonham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Nye, Jr
Represented By: Jim W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB 231 Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil & Donna Gray Trust Dated May 5, 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbus Life Insurance Company
Represented By: C William Threlkeld
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?