Cutler v. Universal Pressure Pumping Inc
Plaintiff: Michael Cutler
Defendant: Universal Pressure Pumping Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00615
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:15 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 9/9/2019. (llg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Universal Pressure Pumping Inc . (Broussard, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Universal Pressure Pumping Inc.(Broussard, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Anthony Broussard on behalf of Universal Pressure Pumping Inc (Broussard, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Cutler. Universal Pressure Pumping Inc served on 7/19/2019. (Leonard, Jana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Michael Cutler (Haupt, Shannon)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Michael Cutler (Leonard, Jana)
July 11, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2957281. (Leonard, Jana)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Universal Pressure Pumping Inc. (ac)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Pressure Pumping Inc filed by Michael Cutler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutler v. Universal Pressure Pumping Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cutler
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Pressure Pumping Inc
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?