Lesley v. Oklahoma State of
Petitioner: James Patrick Lesley
Respondent: Oklahoma State of
Case Number: 5:2019cv00616
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Court should construe the Petition as arising under 2241 and should summarily dismiss it as Petitioner lacks any due process rights in Oklahomas parole process. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2019. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 8/7/2019. (dwl)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones; in light of petitioner's payment of filing fee, the Report and Remmendation #5 is stricken as moot; the referral to Magistrate Judge Jones for further proceedings remains in effect. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/25/2019. (lam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from James Patrick Lesley in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500075150 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Balance remaining is $0.00. Receipt mailed to payor. (nv)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Petitioner has more than sufficient funds available to prepay the $5.00 filing fee, Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 , should be denied. If Petitioner does not pay the $5.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within 21 days of an order adopting this Report and Recommendation, IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed, without prejudice to refiling. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 7/11/2019. (dwl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/10/19. (nv)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (nv)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Patrick Lesley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Patrick Lesley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment and Sentence filed 01.06.03 in CF-99-6416, #2 Exhibit B - Petition Case No. CV-2018-685 filed 04.09.18, #3 Exhibit C - Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board MTD filed in CV-2018-685 filed 05.31.18, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Motion to Dismiss filed 06.13.18 in CV-2018-685, #5 Exhibit E - Order Dismissing Petition filed 06.26.18 in CV-2018-685, #6 Exhibit F - Petition in Error filed 07.19.18 in Case No. 117215 Supreme Court of OK, #7 Exhibit G - Response to Petition in Error filed 08.06.18 in SD-117215, #8 Exhibit H - Appeal from the District Court of OK County filed 06.14.19 in 117215, #9 Exhibit I - Letter written by Catherine Hammarsten dated 06.11.15, #10 Exhibit J - Application for Judicial Review Case No. 99-6416 filed 11.24.03, #11 Envelope)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesley v. Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Patrick Lesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?