Kraus v. QEP Resources Inc
Plaintiff: Julie P Kraus
Defendant: QEP Resources Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00618
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Julie P Kraus filed by Julie P Kraus.(Dickinson, Roy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by QEP Resources Inc. (Cooper, Richard)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard Casey Cooper on behalf of QEP Resources Inc (Cooper, Richard)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's state court Petition on or before Friday, August 16, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 7/16/2019. (ks)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by QEP Resources Inc. (Cooper, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James Wesley Pebsworth on behalf of QEP Resources Inc (Pebsworth, James)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/11/19. (jw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/11/19. (jw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard Casey Cooper on behalf of QEP Resources Inc (Cooper, Richard)
July 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2956130. (Cooper, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kingfisher County District Court, case number CJ-2019-78 filed by QEP Resources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraus v. QEP Resources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie P Kraus
Represented By: Roy S Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEP Resources Inc
Represented By: Richard Casey Cooper
Represented By: James Wesley Pebsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?