Seward v. Flex-Chem Corporation
Plaintiff: Michael S Seward
Defendant: Flex-Chem Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00621
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Flex-Chem Corporation . (Voth, Lauren)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn D Terry on behalf of Flex-Chem Corporation (Terry, Kathryn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Flex-Chem Corporation.(Voth, Lauren)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren Symcox Voth on behalf of Flex-Chem Corporation (Voth, Lauren)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael S Seward. Flex-Chem Corporation served on 7/16/2019. (Leonard, Jana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Michael S Seward (Haupt, Shannon)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Michael S Seward (Leonard, Jana)
July 11, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2957275. (Leonard, Jana)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Flex-Chem Corporation. (kmt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flex-Chem Corporation filed by Michael S Seward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seward v. Flex-Chem Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Seward
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flex-Chem Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Symcox Voth
Represented By: Kathryn D Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?