James et al v. Berexco et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ring, Elizabeth Tilson-Parrish, Brenda Duverney-Chappell, Carlton Morrison, Ladonna Lowrey, Brenda Fields, Stevie Johnson, James Adam Hendricks, Amanda Guliford, Chris Stephens, Arthur Ganther, Sr, Malinda Guzman, Gary Hatcher, Bill W Uselton, Anthony Tansimore, Alireza Dabiri, Arthur L Rutledge, Alphons Efiom, April W Hendricks, Alfonzo McMillian, Barbara Dobbs, Alphonso Quesada Rodriguez, Martha Dunlap, Eartha Tansimore, Katherine Ganther, Anthony Parrish, White Star Petroleum LLC, Marcellus Fields, John Belardo, John E Shadoan, Betty McBride, Bart Lowrey, Rodney E McDonald, Yvette Morrison, Birlene Langley, John Locke, Laura Wisdom, Angela Dillman-Smith, Abolghasem Sam Adaei, Audry Ochoa, Jeff Jarvis, Anastasia E Dalton, Anthony Dunlap, Bertha A Richardson, Angela Duckett, Bryan Dobbs, Allison Stephens, Alronda Sheree Smith, Arthur Willmon, Barry Latschar, Aaron Scotty Glenn, Angela D Hill, Bryan Cain, Alvin Simmons, Hazel Shevat, Amanda Jarvis, Ashley Block, Andrew Clay, Theresa Cain, Barbara Hinkle, Larry Kent Splawn, Bennie L McDonald, Beverly Fourroux, Beth A Rutledge, Beverly Ann Splawn, Brittani Belardo, Melvin Melvin, Trudi Dillma-Smith, Anthony Carter, Andrew J Dunlap, Sr, Carol A Brewer, Bobbie Horne, Angie Patton, Beatrice Haywood, Belinda Shoals, Carl Williams, Roger Fourroux, Anita Hatcher, Anthony R Battle, Alexander S Shevat, Andre'e Reutlinger, Don McBride, Christi A Hinkle, Abolghasem Fadaei, Carlos Guzman, Raymond Brewer, Bettie Shadoan, Babi Locke, Andrew James Dunlap, Jr, Bobby D Hinkle, Afzal Salviri, AJ James, Alice Strong Simmons, Billy Tubbs, Connie Simmons, Ronni Hatcher, Carl D James, Andrea Lister, Anita Prince, Melvin Lister, III, Blanche Evakich and Herman Haywood
Defendant: Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Does 1-25, Territory Resources LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Equal Energy US Inc, Range Production Company LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Koby Oil Company LLC, Petro Warrior LLC, Shields Operating Inc, Cher Oil Company LTD, Special Energy Corporation, Crown Energy Company, International Energy Corporation, Circle 9 Resources LLC, Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC, Chaparral Energy LLC, Montclair Energy LLC, Tarka Energy LLC, Oakland Petroleum Operating Company Inc, Midstates Petroleum Company LLC, FHA Investments LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Berexco LLC, Eastok Pipeline LLC and Cimarron River Operating Corp
Case Number: 5:2019cv00646
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #74 Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/19/2019. (llg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cher Oil Company LTD, Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC. (Thetford, Grant)
November 4, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Crown Energy Company. (Dobson, Jay)
November 4, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Special Energy Corporation. (McDaniel, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases)(Stein, Patrick)
November 4, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc. (Pritchett, E)
November 4, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tarka Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs [Second] Motion for State Wide Consolidation, #2 Exhibit Tarka's Response, #3 Exhibit E-Mail Exchange)(Hixon, Stacie)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER regarding #74 Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Defendants are DIRECTED to file any response to plaintiffs' motion no later than November 4, 2019. Plaintiffs' responses to the motions to dismiss and motion for judgment on the pleadings are STAYED pending resolution of plaintiffs' motion. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/24/2019. (ac)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER regarding #73 Defendant Orca Operating Company LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Lack of Service of Process. As permitted by #61 9/20/2019 Order, plfs shall have until 10/31/2019 to respond to the remaining arguments in #4 Defendant Orca Operating Company LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/23/2019. (llg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Atkins, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE (other) by Orca Operating Company LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Lack of Service of Process (Stein, Patrick)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The motion to extend time to respond until October 29, 2019. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/22/2019. (ac)
October 21, 2019 Filing 71 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Hanlon, Bria)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plfs are DIRECTED to show good cause by 10/24/2019 for their failure to effect service of process upon dft Orca Operating Company LLC. If plfs fail to show good cause & the court declines to permissively extend the time for service of process, plfs' petition against dft Orca shall be dismissed w/o prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/17/2019. (llg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss by Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc. (Pritchett, E)
October 10, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Territory Resources LLC. (Stein, Patrick)
October 10, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss by Crown Energy Company. (Dobson, Jay)
October 10, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss by Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Range Production Company LLC. (Stein, Patrick)
October 8, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Special Energy Corporation. (McDaniel, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss by Tarka Energy LLC. (Hixon, Stacie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss by Cher Oil Company LTD, Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sides, et al., v. Mohawk, et al., Case No. 103,935)(Thetford, Grant)
September 23, 2019 Filing 62 ENTRY of Appearance by Mackenzie L Smith on behalf of Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC (Smith, Mackenzie)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Orca Operating Company LLC is Held in Abeyance until further order of the court. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/20/2019. (ac)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that Defendants shall have 21 days from the date of this orderto refile their motions to dismiss. Any response to any motion to dismiss and any reply to any response shall likewise be filed in conformity with the courts Local Civil Rules. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/19/2019. (ac)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, filed August 16, 2019 #56 , is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/19/2019. (ac)
September 6, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc. (Pritchett, E)
September 5, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC. (Stein, Patrick)
August 16, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Atkins, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2019 Filing 55 (TEXT ONLY) ORDER striking #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for failure to fully comply with LCvR83.3(b). If the motion is correctly refiled, counsel is not required to pay the $50 pro hac vice fee a second time. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/15/2019. (llg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 54 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey R Atkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Atkins, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2977946 by All Plaintiffs. (Atkins, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE from the Court STRIKING #52 Notice (other) (Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice), for failure to comply with LCvR83.2(g) and 83.3(b). (llg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 52 (STRICKEN by 8/14/2019 Notice from the Court) NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Atkins, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/14/2019 (llg).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney W G Steidley, Jr withdrawn as counsel for Tarka Energy LLC. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/8/2019. (llg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tarka Energy LLC. (Steidley, W)
August 8, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Tarka Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tarka Energy, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Defendant Marjo Operating LLC's Joinder to CoDefendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hixon, Stacie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Tarka Energy LLC . (Hixon, Stacie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Stacie L Hixon on behalf of Tarka Energy LLC (Hixon, Stacie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Philard L Rounds, Jr on behalf of Tarka Energy LLC (Rounds, Philard)
August 8, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles D Neal, Jr on behalf of Tarka Energy LLC (Neal, Charles)
July 29, 2019 Filing 44 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Montclair Energy LLC . (Pritchett, E)
July 29, 2019 Filing 43 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Special Energy Corporation . (McDaniel, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by John R Woodard, III on behalf of Special Energy Corporation (Woodard, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC . (Thetford, Grant)
July 26, 2019 Filing 40 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cher Oil Company LTD . (Thetford, Grant)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re [1-8] Notice of Bankruptcy filed by White Star Petroleum LLC, re #18 Notice of Bankruptcy filed by International Energy Corporation. Plfs' action against dfts International Energy Corporation and White Star Petroleum LLC is stayed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362. Until otherwise notified, plfs' action continues as against the remaining dfts. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 7/26/2019. (llg)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE from the Court re #21 Notice of Pending Motions, re #35 Notice of Pending Motions. Counsel for ALL PARTIES are DIRECTED, in future filings, to comply with the court's ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. - "... A description [more than just the exhibit no.] of the numbered exhibit must be provided in the docket entry...." Failure to comply in the future may result in filings being stricken. (llg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Shields Operating Inc . (Pritchett, E)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/25/2019. (mb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Grant B Thetford on behalf of Cher Oil Company LTD, Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC (Thetford, Grant)
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Crown Energy Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dobson, Jay)
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Energy Company.(Dobson, Jay)
July 24, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Jay W Dobson on behalf of Crown Energy Company (Dobson, Jay)
July 24, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey M Love on behalf of Crown Energy Company (Love, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by L Vance Brown on behalf of Crown Energy Company (Brown, L)
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Complaint) by Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc.(Pritchett, E)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Territory Resources LLC . (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Range Production Company LLC . (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Orca Operating Company LLC . (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC . (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Chesapeake Operating LLC . (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Berexco LLC . (Stein, Patrick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc re #13 Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Equal Energy Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Shields Adoption and Joinder, #3 Exhibit Montclair Adoption and Joinder, #4 Exhibit Petco Adoption and Joinder, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response)(Pritchett, E)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Special Energy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-A)(McDaniel, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Special Energy Corporation.(McDaniel, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J McDaniel on behalf of Special Energy Corporation (McDaniel, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by International Energy Corporation (Henson, Trevor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan M McLemore on behalf of Cher Oil Company LTD, Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC (McLemore, Evan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Trevor R Henson on behalf of Cher Oil Company LTD, Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC (Henson, Trevor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine A Butts on behalf of Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc (Butts, Catherine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua L Young on behalf of Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc (Young, Joshua)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 (STRICKEN. Correctly refiled at doc. no. 22.) NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc Motions to Dismiss (Pritchett, E) Modified on 7/25/2019 (llg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by E Edd Pritchett, Jr on behalf of Equal Energy US Inc, Montclair Energy LLC, Petco Petroleum Corp, Shields Operating Inc (Pritchett, E)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Range Production Company LLC.(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC.(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chesapeake Operating LLC.(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Berexco LLC.(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Range Production Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Orca Operating Company LLC.(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick L Stein on behalf of Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC (Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Orca Operating Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Motions Hearing)(Stein, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by J Todd Woolery on behalf of Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC (Woolery, J)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J Bomhoff on behalf of Berexco LLC, Chesapeake Operating LLC, Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC, Orca Operating Company LLC, Range Production Company LLC, Territory Resources LLC (Bomhoff, Timothy)
July 18, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2961570. (Bomhoff, Timothy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-5143 filed by Orca Operating Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition (James), #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dismissal of EastOK, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tarka Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Territory's Answer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Dismissal of Midstates, #7 Exhibit 7 - Dismissal of Chaparral, #8 Exhibit 8 - White Star Notice of Bankruptcy, #9 Exhibit 9 - Dismissal of Circle 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Berexco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ring
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tilson-Parrish
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Duverney-Chappell
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Morrison
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna Lowrey
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Fields
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie Johnson
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Adam Hendricks
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Guliford
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Stephens
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ganther, Sr
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Guzman
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hatcher
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill W Uselton
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tansimore
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alireza Dabiri
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur L Rutledge
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphons Efiom
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April W Hendricks
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonzo McMillian
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dobbs
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Quesada Rodriguez
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Dunlap
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eartha Tansimore
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Ganther
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Parrish
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Star Petroleum LLC
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus Fields
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Belardo
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Shadoan
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty McBride
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Lowrey
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney E McDonald
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Morrison
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birlene Langley
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Locke
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wisdom
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Dillman-Smith
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abolghasem Sam Adaei
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audry Ochoa
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Jarvis
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia E Dalton
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dunlap
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha A Richardson
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Duckett
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Dobbs
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Stephens
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alronda Sheree Smith
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Willmon
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Latschar
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Scotty Glenn
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D Hill
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Cain
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Simmons
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Shevat
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Jarvis
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Block
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Clay
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Cain
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hinkle
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kent Splawn
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie L McDonald
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Fourroux
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth A Rutledge
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Ann Splawn
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittani Belardo
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Melvin
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudi Dillma-Smith
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Carter
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J Dunlap, Sr
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A Brewer
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Horne
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Patton
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Haywood
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Shoals
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Williams
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Fourroux
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hatcher
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R Battle
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander S Shevat
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre'e Reutlinger
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don McBride
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi A Hinkle
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abolghasem Fadaei
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Guzman
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettie Shadoan
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babi Locke
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew James Dunlap, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby D Hinkle
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afzal Salviri
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ James
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Strong Simmons
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Tubbs
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Simmons
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronni Hatcher
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl D James
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Lister
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Prince
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Lister, III
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Evakich
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Haywood
Represented By: Jeffrey R Atkins
Represented By: Bria A Hanlon
Represented By: Daniel P Markoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Con Energy Operating LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Mackenzie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Territory Resources LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Mackenzie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orca Operating Company LLC
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Mackenzie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equal Energy US Inc
Represented By: Catherine Alexandra Brady
Represented By: Joshua L Young
Represented By: E Edd Pritchett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Range Production Company LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Mackenzie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Petroleum Corp
Represented By: Catherine Alexandra Brady
Represented By: Joshua L Young
Represented By: E Edd Pritchett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koby Oil Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Warrior LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shields Operating Inc
Represented By: Catherine Alexandra Brady
Represented By: Joshua L Young
Represented By: E Edd Pritchett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cher Oil Company LTD
Represented By: Trevor R Henson
Represented By: Evan M McLemore
Represented By: Grant B Thetford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Energy Corporation
Represented By: Michael J McDaniel
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Energy Company
Represented By: L Vance Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey M Love
Represented By: Jay W Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Energy Corporation
Represented By: Trevor R Henson
Represented By: Evan M McLemore
Represented By: Grant B Thetford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle 9 Resources LLC
Represented By: E Edd Pritchett, Jr
Represented By: Joshua L Young
Represented By: Catherine Alexandra Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjo Operating Mid-Continent LLC
Represented By: Trevor R Henson
Represented By: Evan M McLemore
Represented By: Grant B Thetford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaparral Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montclair Energy LLC
Represented By: Catherine Alexandra Brady
Represented By: Joshua L Young
Represented By: E Edd Pritchett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarka Energy LLC
Represented By: Stacie L Hixon
Represented By: W G Steidley, Jr
Represented By: Charles D Neal, Jr
Represented By: Philard L Rounds, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Petroleum Operating Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstates Petroleum Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FHA Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Mackenzie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berexco LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Mackenzie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastok Pipeline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimarron River Operating Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?