Jordan et al v. Grace Living Centers
Plaintiff: Demetria Jordan
Defendant: Grace Living Centers
Case Number: 5:2019cv00654
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Grace Living Centers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mike Dimond)(Christensen, J)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 3, 2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/30/2019. (jb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed by All Defendants. (Molsbee, Lisa)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Grace Living Centers answer due 8/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/16/2019. (jb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Chris R Miltenberger on behalf of Demetria Jordan(on behalf of all those similarly situated) (Miltenberger, Chris)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Grace Living Centers. (Christensen, J)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Brock Z Pittman on behalf of Grace Living Centers (Pittman, Brock)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa M Molsbee on behalf of Grace Living Centers (Molsbee, Lisa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by J Clay Christensen on behalf of Grace Living Centers (Christensen, J)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Miltenberger shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before August 26, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/12/2019. (jb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2975154 by Demetria Jordan(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Application for Admission)(Wandres, Victor)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetria Jordan(individually). Grace Living Centers served on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Green Card)(Wandres, Victor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (other) by Demetria Jordan(individually) of Filing Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents)(Wandres, Victor)
July 19, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2962144. (Wandres, Victor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Grace Living Centers. (ank)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grace Living Centers filed by Demetria Jordan(individually), Demetria Jordan(on behalf of all those similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ank).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan et al v. Grace Living Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Living Centers
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Lisa M Molsbee
Represented By: Brock Z Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetria Jordan
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?