Smith v. Wal-Mart Associates Inc
Plaintiff: Patricia Deanne Smith
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00662
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/02/2019 @ 09:40 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2019. (lam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Associates Inc.(Solberg, Joshua)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Patricia Deanne Smith. (Hurst, Amber)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of Patricia Deanne Smith (Richards, Kristin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Amber L Hurst on behalf of Patricia Deanne Smith (Hurst, Amber)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of Patricia Deanne Smith (Hammons, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 08/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/25/2019. (lam)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Associates Inc. (Good, Paige)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER counsel for parties are directed to file their entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 07/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/23/2019. (lam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Associates Inc . (Solberg, Joshua)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Paige H Good on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc (Good, Paige)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua W Solberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc (Solberg, Joshua)
July 22, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2962780. (Solberg, Joshua)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2019-3327 filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-PETITION, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons, #3 Exhibit 3-OSCN Case Details, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wal-Mart Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Deanne Smith
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates Inc
Represented By: Paige H Good
Represented By: Joshua W Solberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?