Holmes v. GPM Southeast LLC
Plaintiff: Audrey L Holmes
Defendant: GPM Southeast LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00684
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING #6 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Audrey L Holmes. Plf is DIRECTED to pay $25.00 on or before the 1st day of each month until the $400.00 filing fee is paid in full. Failure of plf to pay the filing fee as directed by the court may result in plf's complaint & action being dismissed pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk of the court shall not issue process until at least $100.00 of the $400.00 filing fee has been paid by plf. The clerk of the court shall notify the court when at least $100.00 has been paid by plf. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/10/2019. (llg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Receipt for Money Received from Audrey L Holmes in the amount of $25.00, receipt number OKW500075878 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance $375.00. (ac)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Audrey L Holmes. The undersigned recommends the court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2019. This terminates the referral in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/19/19. (lb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Audrey L Holmes. (rb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must supplement her application on or before 8/18/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 7/29/19. (lb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Audrey L Holmes Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. by direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 7/29/2019. (sr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Audrey L Holmes. (ac)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GPM Southeast LLC filed by Audrey L Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2- Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. GPM Southeast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey L Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPM Southeast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?