Santifer v. Apex Midstream Inspection LLC
Plaintiff: Ricky Santifer
Defendant: Apex Midstream Inspection LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00696
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard J. Burch. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/23/2019. (md)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard J. Burch Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3002368 by Ricky Santifer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Cert of Good Standing, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Josephson, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Taylor A Jones on behalf of Ricky Santifer (Jones, Taylor)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/16/2019. (md)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2997919 by Ricky Santifer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV of Jones, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Josephson, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTER ORDER Plaintiffs counsel are advised that they must associate with local counsel pursuantto LCvR 83.3 and local counsel shall file an entry of appearance within seven days fromthe date of this Order. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/12/2019. (md)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 10/24/2019. (md)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Collective Action Complaint by Apex Midstream Inspection LLC.(Albert, Victor)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin P Grose on behalf of Apex Midstream Inspection LLC (Grose, Justin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Victor F Albert on behalf of Apex Midstream Inspection LLC (Albert, Victor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Ricky Santifer (Dunlap, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Santifer. Apex Midstream Inspection LLC served on 8/1/2019. (Josephson, Michael)
July 31, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2968860. (Josephson, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Apex Midstream Inspection LLC. (rb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apex Midstream Inspection LLC filed by Ricky Santifer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santifer v. Apex Midstream Inspection LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Santifer
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Taylor A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Midstream Inspection LLC
Represented By: Victor F Albert
Represented By: Justin P Grose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?