Maguire-OHara Construction Inc et al v. Cool Roofing Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Maguire-OHara Construction Inc and United States of America
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Cool Roofing Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00705
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 10/25/2019. (jw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN MOTION for Order on Application for Admission by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Brigid)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Brigid F Kennedy on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Kennedy, Brigid)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #17 MOTION for Order on Application for Admission, STRICKEN as motion is now moot. (ank)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER; On August 28, 2019, Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(PIIC) filed its Answer in this case. It appears from the record that PIIC is represented by Ryan Dry of Krebs, Farley & Dry, PLLC, whose offices are located in Plano, Texas. As Mr. Dry is apparently not a resident of, and does not maintain an office in, Oklahoma, he is required to comply with LCvR83.3(a), which requires association of non-resident counsel with local counsel, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/28/19. (jw)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company . (Dry, Ryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan D Dry on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Dry, Ryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Dry, Ryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maguire-OHara Construction Inc. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 8/7/2019. (Rupert, Anton)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maguire-OHara Construction Inc. (Rupert, Anton)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maguire-OHara Construction Inc. Cool Roofing Systems Inc served on 8/5/2019. (Rupert, Anton)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cool Roofing Systems Inc . (Neal, Lane)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cool Roofing Systems Inc.(Neal, Lane)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lane R Neal on behalf of Cool Roofing Systems Inc (Neal, Lane)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Rupert, Anton)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Geren T Steiner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steiner, Geren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Anton J Rupert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rupert, Anton)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cool Roofing Systems Inc, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (nv)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cool Roofing Systems Inc, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by United States of America, Maguire-OHara Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Payment Bond, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)
July 31, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2969304. (Rupert, Anton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maguire-OHara Construction Inc et al v. Cool Roofing Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maguire-OHara Construction Inc
Represented By: Anton J Rupert
Represented By: Geren T Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anton J Rupert
Represented By: Geren T Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Brigid F Kennedy
Represented By: Ryan D Dry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool Roofing Systems Inc
Represented By: Lane R Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?