Shawnee City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Shawnee City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, MD Harvey Jenkins, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Corp, The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Russell Portenoy, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Physician Total Care Inc, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00711
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sanford C Coats terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/25/2019. (md)
September 25, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Sanford C. Coats by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Motions terminated: #42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/25/2019. (md)
September 19, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Remand filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Epstein, Jon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 19, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 19, 2019 Filing 45 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Stay- Ada, #2 Exhibit Memorandum and Order Granting Stay- Seminole, #3 Exhibit Opinion and Order Granting Stay- Osage, #4 Exhibit Opinion and Order Granting Stay- Pawnee, #5 Exhibit Opinion and Order Granting Stay- Delaware, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Stay- Jenks, #7 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order, #8 Exhibit Opinion and Order Granting Stay- Lac Courte, #9 Exhibit Order Granting Motions to Stay, #10 Exhibit Order for Remand- Commonwealth of Kentucky, #11 Exhibit Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit Order Staying Actions Pending JPML Action, #16 Exhibit Recommended Decision on PL Motions to Remand and DF Motions to Stay Proceedings, #17 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Stay- Alexandria, #18 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion and Order- Galax, VA, #19 Exhibit Order Staying Action Pending JPML Action, #20 Exhibit Notification of Docket Entry, #21 Exhibit Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 16, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Burns, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Order)(Quinn, Ashley)
September 13, 2019 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley)
September 13, 2019 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
September 11, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Case List)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 29, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Expedite by Shawnee City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber County Utah v Purdue Pharma LP, #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah County Utah v Purdue Pharma LP, #3 Exhibit 3 - Randolph Remand Memo and Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie - Memorandum Opinion, #5 Exhibit 5 - IPRF - Memorandum Opinion)(Court, Todd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Remand by Shawnee City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Pleadings as more fully set forth herein #35 . Motion Terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/23/2019. (md)
August 23, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 15, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #33 Disclosure Statement - Corporate STRICKEN. This document is not a Disclosure Statement. Counsel is directed to refile choosing the correct event. (md)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 STRICKEN DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 8/15/2019 (md).
August 14, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. Distributor Defendants' Answer is due within 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/14/2019. (md)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Burns, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Coats, Sanford)
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford)
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer to Petition (Valuck), #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service (Valuck), #5 Exhibit 5 - Return of Service (Jenkins), #6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance (AmerisourceBergen), #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance (McKesson), #8 Exhibit 8 - Motion & Special Appearance (McKesson), #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #10 Exhibit 10 - Appearance (Cardinal), #11 Exhibit 11 - Appearance (Quest), #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #13 Exhibit 13 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), #14 Exhibit 14 - Motion for Extension (MFs), #15 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Motion (MFs), #16 Exhibit 16 - Appearance (Anda), #17 Exhibit 17 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #19 Exhibit 19 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #20 Exhibit 20 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #21 Exhibit 21 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. Quest shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/7/2019. (md)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUIREMENTS TO GIVE NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Epstein, Jon)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct Caption. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is the party Defendant. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/6/2019. (md)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Reflect Substitution of Party by Amerisourcebergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mallinckrodt LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-2019-4 filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - OSCN Case Docket - Pottawatomie County; CJ-19-4, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1.7.19 Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1.22.19 Return of Summons of William Valuck, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1.22.19 Answer of William Valuck, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2.5.19 Return of Summons - Harvey Jenkins, #7 Exhibit 7 - 7.17.19 Attorney Entry of Appearance for Amerisourcebergen, #8 Exhibit 8 - 7.18.19 Entry of Appearance of Kaylee Davis-Maddy, #9 Exhibit 9 - 7.18.19 Unopposed Motion and Special Appearance, #10 Exhibit 10 - 7.19.19 Entry of Appearance of Ryan A. Ray, #11 Exhibit 11 - 7.19.19 Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion, #12 Exhibit 12 - 7.22.19 Entry of Appearance of D. Todd Riddles, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7.22.19 Defendant, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc's Unopposed Motion, #14 Exhibit Order Granting Extension of Time, #15 Exhibit 15 - 7.25.19 Manufacturer Defendants' Unopposed Motion, #16 Exhibit 16 - 7.26.19 Order Granting Manufacturer Defendants' Motion, #17 Exhibit 17 - 7.30.19 Entry of Appearance of Jeffery A. Curran and Ashley E. Quinn, #18 Exhibit 18 - 7.30.19 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)
August 2, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2970343. (Epstein, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawnee City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Terry W West
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Bradley C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?