City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Defendant: Arty Straehla, Mark Layton and Mammoth Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00720
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE. Refer to CIV-19-522-SLP [Doc. No. 41] for detailed Docket text. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/13/2019. (md)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Atara Hirsch; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell Twersky; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ian Berg. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/22/2019. (md)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Receipt for Money Received from City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500075703 regarding #6 SECOND MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ian Berg) (rb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500075705 regarding #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Atara Hirsch) (rb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Receipt for Money Received from City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500075704 regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mitchell Twersky) (rb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ian Berg) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Admission Form - Berg)(Tawwater, Darren)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ian Berg) STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to attach the Exhibit. (md)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mitchell Twersky) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Admission Form - Twersky)(Tawwater, Darren)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Atara Hirsch) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Admission Form - Hirsch)(Tawwater, Darren)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 STRICKEN MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ian Berg) by All Plaintiffs. (Tawwater, Darren) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 8/15/2019 (md).
August 7, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2973449. (Tawwater, Darren)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla. (rb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arty Straehla filed by City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arty Straehla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sarasota General Employees Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Represented By: Larry A Tawwater
Represented By: Darren M Tawwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?