Markz Jet LTD v. Cloud Nine Aviation LLC
Plaintiff: Markz Jet LTD
Defendant: Cloud Nine Aviation LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00744
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #12 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Answer to Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Markz Jet LTD. (Fontanez, Noah)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cloud Nine Aviation LLC Amended. (Thompson, John)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Disclosure Statement - Corporate filed by Cloud Nine Aviation LLC. Within seven days of the date of this Order, Defendant Cloud Nine Aviation, LLC shall file an amended disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR 7.1.1. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/25/2019. (md)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cloud Nine Aviation LLC . (Thompson, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Cloud Nine Aviation LLC.(Thompson, John)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Markz Jet LTD . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Coporate Disclosure Statement of Citizenship)(Fontanez, Noah)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER within seven days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff Markz Jet Ltd. LP shall file an amended disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR 7.1.1. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/13/2019. (md)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markz Jet LTD. Cloud Nine Aviation LLC served on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fontanez, Noah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Markz Jet LTD . (Fontanez, Noah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Noah Fontanez on behalf of Markz Jet LTD (Fontanez, Noah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by John M Thompson on behalf of Cloud Nine Aviation LLC (Thompson, John)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERgranting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Cloud Nine Aviation LLC answer due 9/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/11/2019. (md)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Respond to Complaint by Cloud Nine Aviation LLC. (Thompson, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Markz Jet LTD in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 1087-2979716 regarding #1 Complaint, (rb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cloud Nine Aviation LLC. (rb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cloud Nine Aviation LLC filed by Markz Jet LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Aircraft Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2- Demand to Close, #3 Exhibit 3- Technical Acceptance Letter, #4 Exhibit 4- Return to Operational Status Certificate, #5 Exhibit 5- Notice of Competing Claims of Default, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markz Jet LTD v. Cloud Nine Aviation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud Nine Aviation LLC
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markz Jet LTD
Represented By: Noah Fontanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?