Great West Casualty Company v. Fast Haul Inc et al
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Defendant: Fast Haul Inc, Shannon Fast, Cyndy Kay Morse, Steven Dalton and Domino Transports, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00775
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene by Domino Transports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention)(Parrilli, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph R Farris on behalf of Domino Transports, Inc. (Farris, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathaniel G Parrilli on behalf of Domino Transports, Inc. (Parrilli, Nathaniel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 02:00 PM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 11/26/2019. (jb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Shannon Fast, Fast Haul Inc.(Houts, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Steven Dalton, Cyndy Kay Morse(an Individual), Cyndy Kay Morse(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kasey Jill Morse, Deceased).(Tharp, William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by William D Tharp on behalf of Steven Dalton, Cyndy Kay Morse(an Individual), Cyndy Kay Morse(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kasey Jill Morse, Deceased) (Tharp, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Shannon Fast, Fast Haul Inc. (ank)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Steven Dalton, Cyndy Kay Morse(an Individual), Cyndy Kay Morse(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kasey Jill Morse, Deceased). (ank)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jace T White on behalf of Great West Casualty Company (White, Jace)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Great West Casualty Company . (Curran, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Great West Casualty Company (Curran, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2984490. (Curran, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Dalton, Shannon Fast, Fast Haul Inc, Cyndy Kay Morse(an Individual), Cyndy Kay Morse(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kasey Jill Morse, Deceased) filed by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great West Casualty Company v. Fast Haul Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Haul Inc
Represented By: Mark B Houts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Fast
Represented By: Mark B Houts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyndy Kay Morse
Represented By: William D Tharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dalton
Represented By: William D Tharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino Transports, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel G Parrilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Jace T White
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?