Cimarron County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Cimarron County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Physician Total Care Inc, Perry Fine, Purdue Pharma Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, GCP Pharma LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc and Anda Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00776
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw Stuart Ashworth by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Ashworth, Stuart)
October 16, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 16, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 16, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OH Stmt of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - OH Order on Mtn to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 16, 2019 Filing 39 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Jenks Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - JPML 5542 CTO, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wis Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cal Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - Alameda Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - Portland Order, #18 Exhibit 18 - EDVA Order, #19 Exhibit 19 - WDVA Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Cal Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - Ill Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Defendants Anda Inc and Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/2/2019. (llg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Order)(Quinn, Ashley) Modified on 10/2/2019 (llg).
October 1, 2019 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley)
October 1, 2019 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/1/2019. (llg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 32 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G) Modified on 10/1/2019 (llg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite by Cimarron County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand by Cimarron County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney Sanford C Coats withdrawn. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/25/2019. (llg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Sanford C. Coats by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford)
September 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Burns, Joshua)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. The referenced defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than sixty (60) days following the later of 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand.. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/16/2019. (ac)
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Petition forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/3/2019. (ac)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER the Manufacturer Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition by forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action.granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/30/2019. (sr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Appearance, #5 Exhibit Appearance, #6 Exhibit Appearance, #7 Exhibit Motion, #8 Exhibit Appearance, #9 Exhibit Motion, #10 Exhibit Appearance, #11 Exhibit Motion, #12 Exhibit Order, #13 Exhibit Appearance, #14 Exhibit Motion, #15 Exhibit Motion, #16 Exhibit Order, #17 Exhibit Order, #18 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 26, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2985312. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cimarron County, case number CJ-2019-00004 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons - Actavis LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons - Actavis Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons - Actavis PLC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons - Amerisourcebergen, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons - Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons - Anda, Inc, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons - Cardinal Health, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons - Cephalon, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons - CVS Health Corporation, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons - CVS Pharmacy, Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 - Summons - Endo Health Solutions, #14 Exhibit 14 - Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, #15 Exhibit 15 - Summons - GCP Pharma, LLC, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons - Insys Therapeutics, #17 Exhibit 17 - Summons - Janssen Pharmaceutica, #18 Exhibit 18 - Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #19 Exhibit 19 - Summons - Johnson & Johnson, #20 Exhibit 20 - Summons - Keysource Medical, Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 - Summons - Lynn Webster, M.D, #22 Exhibit 22 - Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC, #23 Exhibit 23 - Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC, #24 Exhibit 24 - Summons - McKesson Corporation, #25 Exhibit 25 - Summons - Morris & Dickson, #26 Exhibit 26 - Summons - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, #27 Exhibit 27 - Summons - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #28 Exhibit 28 - Summons - Perry Fine, M.D, #29 \Exhibit 29 - Summons - Physicians Total Care, #30 Exhibit 30 - Summons - Physicians Total Care, #31 Exhibit 31 - Summons - Physicians Total Care, #32 Exhibit 32 - Summons - Purdue Pharma Inc, #33 Exhibit 33 - Summons - Purdue Pharma L.P, #34 Exhibit 34 - Summons - Quest Pharmaceuticals, #35 Exhibit 35 - Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #36 Exhibit 36 - Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #37 Exhibit 37 - Summons - Harvard Drug Group, #38 Exhibit 38 - Summons - Purdue Frederick Company, #39 Exhibit 39 - Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance, #40 Exhibit 40 - Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance, #41 Exhibit 41 - Summons - Watson Laboratories, #42 Exhibit 42 - Summons - Watson Pharma, Inc, #43 Exhibit 43 - Summons - Watson Pharmaceuticals, #44 Exhibit 44 - Summons - Allergan PLC, #45 Exhibit 45 - Summons - Cardinal Health, Inc, #46 Exhibit 46 - EOA - Harvard Drug, #47 Exhibit 47 - EOA - McKesson Corp, #48 Exhibit 48 - Unopposed Motion and Special EOA, #49 Exhibit 49 - EOA Amerisourcebergen, #50 Exhibit 50 - Special EOA and Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, #51 Exhibit 51 - EOA - Anda, #52 Exhibit 52 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement, #53 Exhibit 53 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute, #54 Exhibit 54 - EOA - Quest Pharmaceuticals, #55 Exhibit 55 - Quest Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, #56 Exhibit 56 - Mfg Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension, #57 Exhibit 57 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, #58 Exhibit 58 - Docket Sheet, #59 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cimarron County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Stuart P Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Stuart P Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimarron County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?