Zimmerman v. New Prime Inc
Plaintiff: Lecinda Zimmerman
Defendant: New Prime Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00796
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by New Prime Inc.(Ensley, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by New Prime Inc . (Ensley, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan D Ensley on behalf of New Prime Inc (Ensley, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles H Moody, Jr on behalf of New Prime Inc (Moody, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lecinda Zimmerman. New Prime Inc served on 9/6/2019. (Gallagher, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew G Counts on behalf of Lecinda Zimmerman (Counts, Andrew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by E Todd Tracy on behalf of Lecinda Zimmerman (Tracy, E)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorneys E. Todd Tracy and Andrew G. Counts. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 09/10/19. (wh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Counts Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2993467 by Lecinda Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request)(Gallagher, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice E. Todd Tracy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2993347 by Lecinda Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement)(Gallagher, William)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to New Prime Inc. (em)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by William S Gallagher on behalf of Lecinda Zimmerman (Gallagher, William)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/3/2019. (mb)
August 29, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2987551. (Gallagher, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Prime Inc filed by Lecinda Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. New Prime Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecinda Zimmerman
Represented By: William S Gallagher
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Andrew G Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime Inc
Represented By: Ryan D Ensley
Represented By: Charles H Moody, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?