Noecker et al v. Escobedo et al
Plaintiff: Drew Noecker and Oksana Didyuk
Defendant: Samuel W Escobedo, Marilyn B Escobedo and Yates Roofing and Construction, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00799
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Oksana Didyuk, Drew Noecker. (Bruner, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Oksana Didyuk, Drew Noecker. (Bruner, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Strike #9 Amended Complaint filed by Oksana Didyuk, Drew Noecker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Disclosure Statement, #2 Exhibit 2-Contract of Sale of Real Estate, #3 Exhibit 3-Addendum 04.10.17, #4 Exhibit 4-Inspection Report- Yates, #5 Exhibit 5-Notice of Treatments, Repairs, Replacements, #6 Exhibit 6-Yates estimate 05.10.2017, #7 Exhibit 7-TRR Response 5.13.17, #8 Exhibit 8-Addendum 05.13.17)(Bruner, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Noecker, Oksana Didyuk. Yates Roofing and Construction, LLC served on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Return Receipt for Yates)(Bruner, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Marilyn B Escobedo, Samuel W Escobedo. (White, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #9 Amended Complaint by Marilyn B Escobedo, Samuel W Escobedo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(White, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Yates Webpage)(Bruner, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:50 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 10/23/2019. (ks)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Yates Roofing and Construction, LLC. (kmt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Disclosure Statement, #2 Exhibit 2-Joint Tenancy Deed)(Bruner, Jennifer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert F White on behalf of All Defendants (White, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/9/19. (kmt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Marilyn B Escobedo in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500075923 regarding #5 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (rb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Pro Hac Vice Explanation, #2 Attachment Request For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Agee, Brett)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants.(Agee, Brett)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Connor B Kohlscheen on behalf of All Defendants (Kohlscheen, Connor)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Brett Agee on behalf of All Defendants (Agee, Brett)
August 29, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 19-799 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2987904. (Agee, Brett)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-3837 filed by Marilyn B Escobedo, Samuel W Escobedo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition 2019-7-10, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance - Bruner 2019-7-10, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noecker et al v. Escobedo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Noecker
Represented By: Jennifer A Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oksana Didyuk
Represented By: Jennifer A Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel W Escobedo
Represented By: Brett Agee
Represented By: Connor B Kohlscheen
Represented By: Robert F White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn B Escobedo
Represented By: Brett Agee
Represented By: Connor B Kohlscheen
Represented By: Robert F White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates Roofing and Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?