Fort Cobb City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Fort Cobb City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, MD Harvey Jenkins, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Russell Portenoy, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Perry Fine, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, Anda Inc and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00816
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit Jenks Stay Order, #7 Exhibit JPML 5622 CTO, #8 Exhibit Wis Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Cal Stay Order, #10 Exhibit KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit Alameda Stay Order, #17 Exhibit Portland Stay Order, #18 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit Cal Stay Order, #21 Exhibit Ill Stay Order, #22 Exhibit Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit Ohio Order on Kentucky's Motion to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite by Fort Cobb City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P, #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Fort Cobb City of. (Court, Todd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney Sanford C Coats withdrawn. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/25/2019. (llg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Sanford C. Coats by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. It Is Hereby Ordered that Purdue shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (60) days after the later of an entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action to Caddo County District Court, Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/12/2019. (ac)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, To file Responsive Pleadings by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Way, Evan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Joint Motion to Substitute Party and to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall be substituted as party dft in place of the improperly named AmerisourceBergen Corporation. All future captions shall reflect this change. Dfts McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, The Harvard Drug Group LLC and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plf's petition not later than 60 days following the later of 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/10/2019. (llg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 9/10/2019 (llg).
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
September 4, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2990870. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Caddo County, case number CJ-2019-22 filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons (5), #4 Exhibit 4- Return of Service (McKesson), #5 Exhibit 5-Return of Service (Johnson & Johnson), #6 Exhibit 6-Entry of Appearance (AmerisourceBergenMcBride-Huntsman), #7 Exhibit 7- - Return of Service (ABDC), #8 Exhibit 8-Return of Service (Cardinal), #9 Exhibit 9-Return of Service (Purdue Pharma), #10 Exhibit 10-Summons (31), #11 Exhibit 11- LCvR7.1, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Cobb City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Cobb City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Represented By: Steven W Crow
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?