United States of America v. Helvey et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carolyn J Helvey, Any Other Unknown Claimants to the Subject Land, Terry V Helvey, Daniel S Felan and Stephanie J Felan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00825
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Stephanie J Felan(If Living). (Sewell, Kay)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order Directing Service by Publication. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/28/19. (kmt)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Order Directing Absent Defendants to Appear or Plead by a Day Certain. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/28/19. (kmt)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order Directing Service by Publication by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order Directing Absent Defendants to Appear or Plead by a Day Certain by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Daniel S Felan(If Living) served on 9/17/2019. (Sewell, Kay)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Carolyn J Helvey(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living) served on 9/10/2019. (Sewell, Kay)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Terry V Helvey(If Living) served on 9/10/2019. (Sewell, Kay)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/30/19. (jw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Daniel S Felan(If Living), Daniel S Felan(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living), Stephanie J Felan(If Living), Stephanie J Felan(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living), Carolyn J Helvey(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living), Carolyn J Helvey(If Living), Terry V Helvey(If Living), Terry V Helvey(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living). (ank)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Any Other Unknown Claimants to the Subject Land, Daniel S Felan(If Living), Daniel S Felan(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living), Stephanie J Felan(If Living), Stephanie J Felan(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living), Carolyn J Helvey(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living), Carolyn J Helvey(If Living), Terry V Helvey(If Living), Terry V Helvey(Respective Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Beneficiaries, Trustees, Successors and Assigns if not living) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Joint Tenancy Deed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Marshals Deed, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Helvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn J Helvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Other Unknown Claimants to the Subject Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry V Helvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S Felan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie J Felan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kay D Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?