Citizens State Bank et al v. BK Edge LP
Plaintiff: American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp and Citizens State Bank
Defendant: BK Edge LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00828
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 11/01/19. (wh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Reply Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by BK Edge LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buechler, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE re #2 Notice of Pending Motions, Response to BK Edge Mtn to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Merchant, Samuel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by BK Edge LP Motion to Dismiss of Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit B: Petition, #3 Exhibit C: Docket Report)(Buechler, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2993101. (Buechler, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-873 filed by BK Edge LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant's Original Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Entry of Appearance of Defendant's Counsel, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens State Bank et al v. BK Edge LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp
Represented By: Samuel J Merchant
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens State Bank
Represented By: Samuel J Merchant
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BK Edge LP
Represented By: Daniel P Buechler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?