Proctor v. Whitten
Petitioner: Eric Lee Proctor
Respondent: Rick Whitten
Case Number: 5:2019cv00837
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gary M Purcell
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE titled "Petitioner's Supplemental Objection Number Four" by Eric Lee Proctor (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation by Eric Lee Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ineffective Assistance of Counsel Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Debbie Hayes, #4 Envelope)(kmt)
September 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : The undersigned recommends Petitioner's action re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed as untimely. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/20/2019. (cps)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Receipt for Money Received from Eric Lee Proctor in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500076146 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (kmt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Eric Lee Proctor (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/11/2019. (cps)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE regarding payment by Eric Lee Proctor (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/10/19. (kmt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Lee Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Lee Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?