Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc v. Grams Country & Western Bar LLC
Plaintiff: Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc
Defendant: Grams Country & Western Bar LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00850
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc. Grams Country & Western Bar LLC served on 9/23/2019. (Cave, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by John C Cave on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cave, John)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John C. Cave. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/16/2019. (md)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2998060 by Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application Pro Hac Vice)(Talley, Evan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan W Talley on behalf of Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc (Talley, Evan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas J Sorocco on behalf of Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc (Sorocco, Douglas)
September 16, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2998015. (Sorocco, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark (rb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Grams Country & Western Bar LLC. (rb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grams Country & Western Bar LLC filed by Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GRAHAM CENTRAL STATION Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Yelp Review, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grams Facebook Page, #4 Exhibit 4 - Grams Facebook Page, #5 Exhibit 5 - Grams Facebook Page, #6 Exhibit 6 - Grams Facebook Page, #7 Exhibit 7 - Grams Facebook Page, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cease and Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - Articles of Organization, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc v. Grams Country & Western Bar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grams Country & Western Bar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graham Brothers Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Represented By: Douglas J Sorocco
Represented By: John C Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?