Vance et al v. Belnick LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Backiel and Thomas Vance
Defendant: Staples Inc and Belnick LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00862
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Belnick LLC AMENDED. (Koop, Stanley)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen J Pontius on behalf of Karen Backiel, Thomas Vance (Pontius, Stephen)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Disclosure Statement - Corporate filed by Belnick LLC, #5 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan filed by Thomas Vance, Karen Backiel. The Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan is STRICKEN as premature as more fully set forth herein. Further, within seven days of the date of this Order, Defendant Belnick, LLC shall file an amended disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR 7.1.1. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/28/2019. (md)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Belnick LLC . (Koop, Stanley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Stanley A Koop on behalf of Belnick LLC (Koop, Stanley)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 STRICKEN JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Karen Backiel, Thomas Vance. (Atkinson, Michael) Pursuant to Order entered #8 on 10/28/2019 (md).
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Staples Inc Disclosue Statement. (Leibowitz, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Staples Inc.(Leibowitz, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew S Leibowitz on behalf of Staples Inc (Leibowitz, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Removal Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2999446. (Leibowitz, Andrew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-19-293 filed by Staples Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Specical Entry of Appearance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance et al v. Belnick LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Backiel
Represented By: Stephen J Pontius
Represented By: Michael P Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Vance
Represented By: Stephen J Pontius
Represented By: Michael P Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples Inc
Represented By: Andrew S Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belnick LLC
Represented By: Stanley A Koop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?