Haines v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Plaintiff: Sandra Haines
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00867
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 09:30 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 11/19/2019. (jw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Kari D Holder on behalf of Sandra Haines (Holder, Kari)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court)(Brewer, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
September 18, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2999609. (Brewer, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 10:30 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 10/25/2019. (jw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-1877 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haines v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Haines
Represented By: Mariano Acuna
Represented By: Kari D Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?