Board of County Commissioners of Woods County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Woods County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Actavis plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Allergan plc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Johnson and Johnson, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00878
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Docket Annotation: DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45987, filed 11/12/2019. (kmt)
November 5, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of Ohio on 11/5/19. (rb)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (rb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER,granting and terminating: #29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal (to file Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12) filed by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/30/2019. (md)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting and terminating #28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Inc. as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/30/2019. (md)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/30/19. (jw)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/30/19. (jw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,, (to file Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G)
October 29, 2019 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Order)(Quinn, Ashley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Expedite by Board of County Commissioners of Woods County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand by Board of County Commissioners of Woods County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Don W Danz on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc (Danz, Don)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp answer due 10/4/2021; Cardinal Health Inc answer due defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiffs complaint not later than sixty (60) days following the later of 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/3/19. (jw)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Endo Health Solutions, Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. on behalf of all co-defendant pharmaceutical Manufactures. Manufacturer Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition by forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/1/19. (jw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 supplement, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due not later than forty-five (45) days following the latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/30/19. (jw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance-Quest, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Granting Motion-Quest, #6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance-ABDC, #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance-Cardinal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Appearance-Harvard, #9 Exhibit 9 - Appearance-McKesson, #10 Exhibit 10 - Motion for Extension-McKesson, #11 Exhibit 11 - Motion for Extension-CVS, #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion for Extension-MFs, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order Granting Motion-McKesson, #14 Exhibit 14 - Order Granting Motion-McKesson, #15 Exhibit 15 - Appearance-Anda, #16 Exhibit 16 - Motion for Enlargement-Anda, #17 Exhibit 17 - Appearance-Purdue, #18 Exhibit 18 - Notice of Bankruptcy, #19 Exhibit 19 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
September 23, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3003067. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Woods County District Court, case number CJ-2019-6 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 02 Petition, #3 Exhibit 03 Summons - Purdue Pharma LP, #4 Exhibit 04 Summons - Purdue Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 05 Summons - The Purdue Frederick Company, #6 Exhibit 06 Summons - Cephalon, Inc, #7 Exhibit 07 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, #8 Exhibit 08 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #9 Exhibit 09 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons - Johnson & Johnson, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceutica, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons - Endo Health, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons - Allergan, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons - Actavis PLC, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons - Actavis Pharma, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons - Watson Pharmaceuticals, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons - Watson Pharma, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons - Watson Laboratories, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons - Actavis LLC, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons - Insys Therapeutics, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons - McKesson Corp, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons - Cardinal Health, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons - AmerisourceBergen, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons - Anda Pharmaceuticals, #29 Exhibit 29 Summons - Anda Inc, #30 Exhibit 30 Summons - GCP Pharma, #31 Exhibit 31 Summons - Keysource Medical, #32 Exhibit 32 Summons - Morris & Dickson, #33 Exhibit 33 Summons - Quest Pharmaceuticals, #34 Exhibit 34 Summons - The Harvard Drug Group, #35 Exhibit 35 Summons - Physicians Total Care, #36 Exhibit 36 Summons - Physicians Total Care, #37 Exhibit 37 Summons - Physicians Total Care, #38 Exhibit 38 Summons - CVS Health Corp, #39 Exhibit 39 Summons - CVS Pharmacy, #40 Exhibit 40 Summons - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, #41 Exhibit 41 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance, #42 Exhibit 42 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance, #43 Exhibit 43 Summons - Perry Fine MD, #44 Exhibit 44 Summons - Lynn Webster, #45 Exhibit 45 Entry of Appearance by Quest, #46 Exhibit 46 Unopposed Motion by Quest, #47 Exhibit 47 Order Granting Quest's Motion, #48 Exhibit 48 Entry of Appearance by Cardinal Health, #49 Exhibit 49 Entry of Appearance by Harvard Drug, #50 Exhibit 50 Entry of Appearance (McKesson Corporation), #51 Exhibit 51 Attorney Entry of Appearance (AmerisourceBergen), #52 Exhibit 52 Unopposed Motion and Special Appearance of Defendants McKesson, et al, #53 Exhibit 53 Manufacturer Defendants Unoppposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #54 Exhibit 54 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #55 Exhibit 55 Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion, #56 Exhibit 56 Entry of Appearance by Anda, #57 Exhibit 57 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of time to Answer, #58 Exhibit 58 Entry of Appearance (Purdue Pharma, et al.), #59 Exhibit 59 Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings, #60 Exhibit 60 State-Court Docket Sheet, #61 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of Woods County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Woods County
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?